Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1041273

EP1041273 - FUEL INJECTION PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2002
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 27.02.2002  [2002/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO. LTD.
1-32, Chayamachi, Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-0013 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
Yanmar Diesel Engine Co. Ltd.
1-32, Chayamachi, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0013 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NAGAKURA, Katsuhiko, Yanmar Diesel Eng. Co., Ltd.
1-32, Chayamachi, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0013 / JP
[2000/40]
Representative(s)Leeming, John Gerard
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]Leeming, John Gerard
J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98961436.718.12.1998
[2000/40]
WO1998JP05764
Priority number, dateJP1997035091719.12.1997         Original published format: JP 35091797
JP1997035091819.12.1997         Original published format: JP 35091897
[2000/40]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9932787
Date:01.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1041273
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999
[2000/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:F02M59/46, F02M59/26
[2000/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   NL [2000/40]
TitleGerman:KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZPUMPE[2000/40]
English:FUEL INJECTION PUMP[2000/40]
French:POMPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT[2000/40]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2000Translation filed 
13.06.2000National basic fee paid 
13.06.2000Search fee paid 
13.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
13.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/40]
27.12.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]JPS5775165U  ;
 [X]JPS60128968U  ;
 [Y]JPS59142467U  ;
 [A]JPS6326768U  ;
 [X]JPH0429083U  ;
 [X]JPH04132454U  ;
 [X]JPS58139575U  ;
 [X]JPH0245652  (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO);
 [A]JPS62276262  (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO);
 [A]JPS6331257U