Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0965229

EP0965229 - RECORDING MEDIUM SHARING OBJECTS HAVING A PLURALITY OF CONTENTS, PLAYBACK APPARATUS, PLAYBACK METHOD AND RECORDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/51]SYSTEM OF SHARING OBJECTS HAVING A PLURALITY OF CONTENTS
[2001/50]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  02.01.2009
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.01.2009Opposition rejectedpublished on 04.02.2009  [2009/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/51]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OTOMO, Hitoshi
4-32-B302, Komaoka, Tsurumi-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 230-0071 / JP
02 / TODOKORO, Shigeru
891-33, Kameino
Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken 252-0813 / JP
03 / MIMURA, Hideki, A-104, Marine-City-Kanazawabunko
391, Shibacho, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 236-0012 / JP
[1999/51]
Representative(s)Garkisch, Marcus
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]Garkisch, Marcus
Patentanwälte Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Former [1999/51]Kramer, Reinhold, Dipl.-Ing.
Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
Application number, filing date98961557.025.12.1998
[1999/51]
WO1998JP05908
Priority number, dateJP1997035854625.12.1997         Original published format: JP 35854697
[1999/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9934601
Date:08.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0965229
Date:22.12.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999
[1999/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0965229
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/24
[1999/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/51]
TitleGerman:SPEICHERMEDIUM ZUR GEMEINSAMEN VERWENDUNG VON DATENOBJEKTEN MIT EINER VIELZAHL VON INHALTEN, WIEDERGABEGERÄT, WIEDERGABEMETHODE UND SPEICHERMETHODE[2001/50]
English:RECORDING MEDIUM SHARING OBJECTS HAVING A PLURALITY OF CONTENTS, PLAYBACK APPARATUS, PLAYBACK METHOD AND RECORDING METHOD[2001/50]
French:MOYEN D' ENREGISTREMENT AVEC PARTAGE D'OBJETS AYANT UNE PLURALITE DE CONTENUS, MOYEN DE RESTITUTION, METHODE DE RESTITUTION ET METHODE D'ENREGISTREMENT[2001/50]
Former [1999/51]SYSTEM ZUR GEMEINSAMEN VERWENDUNG VON DATENOBJEKTEN MIT EINER VIELZAHL VON INHALTEN
Former [1999/51]SYSTEM OF SHARING OBJECTS HAVING A PLURALITY OF CONTENTS
Former [1999/51]SYSTEME DE PARTAGE D'OBJETS AYANT UNE PLURALITE DE CONTENUS
Entry into regional phase23.08.1999National basic fee paid 
23.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.08.1999Examination requested  [1999/51]
25.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.2002Fee for grant paid
20.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.08.2003  15.09.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte E.V.
Bahnstrasse 62
D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Eichstädt, Alfred
Maryniok GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät
Leibnizstrasse 6
95447 Bayreuth / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2003/43]
Opponent(s)01  27.08.2003   
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte E.V.
Bahnstrasse 62
D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23
96317 Kronach / DE
06.10.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.04.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.04.2004Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
06.09.2004Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
04.07.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.07.2008
04.07.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.07.2008Date of oral proceedings
16.09.2008Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
26.09.2008Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2009/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR31.08.2006
[2007/30]
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0718845  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * see abstract * * column 6, line 20 - line 47 * * column 8, line 38 - column 9, line 11; figures 10,11 * [A] 9,11,12;
 [A]EP0714098  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,9,11,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0635835  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,5-9,11,12 * see abstract * * column 2, line 30 - column 6, line 13 * * column 13, line 15 - column 28, line 58 *;
 [A]EP0301809  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,9,11,12 * column 5, line 10 - column 7, line 35; figure 1 * * column 10, line 20 - column 11, line 18 *;
 [A]US5684786  (DIELEMAN ADRIANUS HUIBRECHT [NL], et al) [A] 1,2,6,7,9,11,12 * column 5, line 30 - column 7, line 67; figure 5 *;
 [PA]EP0817195  (SONY CORP [JP]) [PA] 1,2,5-12 * column 30, line 6 - column 43, line 22; figures 27-37 *;
 [PA]EP0856849  (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [PA] 1,9,11,12 * page 15, line 25 - page 17, line 7 * * page 22, line 1 - line 6; figure 1B *