Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0972771 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0972771



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 364
05.07.2011 Closing of application Search / examination 2
04.04.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
01.04.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
25.03.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
25.03.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
25.03.2011 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
25.03.2011 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
25.03.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 5
25.03.2011 Means of redress Search / examination 2
11.03.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
09.03.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.03.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
28.02.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
25.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.02.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.02.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
07.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.02.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
06.02.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
25.01.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
25.01.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.01.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
21.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 1
21.11.2008 Description Search / examination 1
21.11.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
21.11.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
19.11.2008 Annex Search / examination 1
19.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 1
19.11.2008 Description Search / examination 1
19.11.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
30.07.2008 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
30.07.2008 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
16.07.2008 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
16.07.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
16.07.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.12.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.12.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.12.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
20.12.2007 Claims Search / examination 1
20.12.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
20.12.2007 Description Search / examination 43
20.12.2007 Description Search / examination 43
20.12.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
19.10.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.10.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.06.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
18.06.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.11.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
09.11.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
08.11.2006 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
08.11.2006 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
08.11.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.11.2006 Translation of priority document Search / examination 32
06.11.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
24.10.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.10.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.10.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.06.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
13.06.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.06.2005 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
02.06.2005 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
27.05.2005 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
06.05.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.05.2005 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
22.12.1999 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
08.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
18.11.1999 Description Search / examination 2
18.11.1999 Drawings Search / examination 2
18.11.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
16.11.1999 Description Search / examination 2
16.11.1999 Drawings Search / examination 2
16.11.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
18.10.1999 Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
11.10.1999 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
26.08.1999 Urgent letter Search / examination 2
19.08.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.08.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
19.08.1999 Description Search / examination 32
19.08.1999 Drawings Search / examination 2
19.08.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
06.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 22
15.07.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
30.06.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
30.06.1999 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 31