Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0972771
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0972771Global Dossier 22.06.2005A4
EP0972771 19.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
JP36697897 26.12.1997
JP9805957 25.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6156910 05.12.2000A
Priority number Date
JP36697897 26.12.1997
JP9805957 25.12.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9933819Global Dossier 08.07.1999A1
Priority number Date
JP36697897 26.12.1997