Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972771

EP0972771 - EPSILON-CAPROLACTONE, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, POLYCAPROLACTONE OBTAINED THEREFROM, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE POLYCAPROLACTONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  08.07.2011
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2011Refusal of applicationpublished on 10.08.2011  [2011/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
1, Teppo-cho
Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0905 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, Ltd.
1, Teppo-cho
Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0905 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / UENO, Takashi
8-2, Kuba 6-chome, Otake-shi
Hiroshima 739-0651 / JP
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Hart-Davis, Jason , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2011/15]Hart-Davis, Jason , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Former [2000/03]Portal, Gérard , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date98961601.625.12.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998JP05957
Priority number, dateJP1997036697826.12.1997         Original published format: JP 36697897
[2000/03]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9933819
Date:08.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972771
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:C07D313/04, B01D3/34, C08G63/08, C07D315/00
[2005/25]
Former International [2000/03]C07D313/04, B01D3/34, C08G63/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/03]
TitleGerman:EPSILON-CAPROLACTON, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG, DARAUS HERGESTELLTES POLYCAPROLACTON UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYCAPROLACTON[2000/03]
English:EPSILON-CAPROLACTONE, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, POLYCAPROLACTONE OBTAINED THEREFROM, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE POLYCAPROLACTONE[2000/03]
French:EPSILON-CAPROLACTONE, SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION, POLYCARBOLACTONE PRODUITE A PARTIR DE CELLE-CI, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE LA POLYCARBOLACTONE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase19.08.1999Translation filed 
18.08.1999National basic fee paid 
18.08.1999Search fee paid 
18.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
13.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2011Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.05.2011
25.03.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/32]
05.04.2011Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/32]
11.05.2011Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.06.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
16.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
02.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
31.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
24.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
10.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
10.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[PX]DE19648244  (BASF) [PX] 1,7 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR1300782  (UNION CARBIDE) [X] 1,7 * page 1 - page 4; claim - *;
 [X]DE1202777  (IVAN TAHY) [X] 7 * page 1 - page 5 *;
 [PX]EP0822193  (MITSUBISHI GAS) [PX] 1-7 * the whole document *
International search[X]US4313879  ;
 [Y]JPH06345755  ;
 [Y]JPH0761982