Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032668

EP1032668 - FIBROBLAST GROWTH FACTOR-19 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.04.2009
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]For all designated states
GENENTECH, INC.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BOTSTEIN, David
2539 Somerset Drive
Belmont, CA 94402 / US
02 / GODDARD, Audrey
110 Congo Street
San Francisco, CA 94131 / US
03 / GURNEY, Austin, L.
1 Debbie Lane
Belmont, CA 94002 / US
04 / HILLAN, Kenneth, J.
64 Seward
San Francisco, CA 94114 / US
05 / LAWRENCE, David, A.
1659 12th Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94122 / US
06 / ROY, Margaret, Ann
2960 Webster Street 4
San Francisco, CA 94123 / US
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Kiddle, Simon John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Kiddle, Simon John , et al
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date98961795.625.11.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998US25190
Priority number, dateUS19970066840P25.11.1997         Original published format: US 66840 P
US1998015834221.09.1998         Original published format: US 158342
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9927100
Date:03.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032668
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1032668
Date:28.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/22]
Search report(s)International search reportEP03.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C07K14/50, C12N15/62, C07K16/22
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:FIBROBLASTEN-WACHSTUMSFAKTOR-19[2000/36]
English:FIBROBLAST GROWTH FACTOR-19[2000/36]
French:FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE DES FIBROBLASTES 19[2000/36]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase09.06.2000National basic fee paid 
09.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
08.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
23.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.04.2008Fee for grant paid
02.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.05.2008
BE28.05.2008
CY28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
IT28.05.2008
GR29.08.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
LU25.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
[2011/25]
Former [2010/44]AT28.05.2008
BE28.05.2008
CY28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
IT28.05.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
LU25.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2010/28]AT28.05.2008
BE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
IT28.05.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
LU25.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2010/06]AT28.05.2008
BE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
IT28.05.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/30]AT28.05.2008
BE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/12]AT28.05.2008
BE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
Former [2008/49]AT28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
ES08.09.2008
Former [2008/47]ES08.09.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]  - HILLIER, L. ET A., "zr01g05.r1 Stratagene NT2 neuronal precursor 937230 Homo sapiens cDNA clone 650264 5'.", DATABASE EMBL - EMEST11, (19970214), XP002099436 [X] 1-25 * the whole document *
 [T]  - NISHIMURA, T. ET AL, "Structure and expression of a novel human FGF, FGF-19, expressed in fetal brain.", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (19990118), vol. 1444, pages 148 - 51, XP002099435 [T] 1-25 * the whole document *
 [X]  - EVANS, G.A. ET AL., "cSRL-186H12-u cSRL flow sorted Chromosome 11 specific cosmid Homo sapiens genomic clone cSRL-186H12.", DATABASE EMBL - EMGSS, (19960716), XP002099437 [X] 1,6,10-12,14,16 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - STRAUSBERG, R., "oz28c05.x1 Soares_total_fetus_Nb2HF8_9w Homo sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:1676648 3', mRNA sequence.", DATABASE EMBL - EMEST6, (19980810), XP002099438 [PX] 1,6,10-12,14,16 * the whole document *
ExaminationWO9914328
 WO9914327
 WO0015666
 WO0015796
    - MING-HONG XIE ET AL, "FGF-19, a novel fibroblast growth factor with unique specificity for FGFR4", CYTOKINE, (199910), vol. 11, no. 10, pages 729 - 735,
    - HARMER N.J. ET AL, "the crystal structure of fibroblast growth factor (FGF) 19 reveals novel features of the FGF family and offers a structural basis for its unusual receptor affinity", BIOCHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 43, doi:doi:10.1021/BI035320K, pages 629 - 640, XP002596986

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BI035320K