Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1040428

EP1040428 - COMPUTERIZED PREPRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  10.05.2013
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 14.08.2013  [2013/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VISTAPRINT TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED
Canon's Court, 22 Victoria Street
Hamilton HM-12 / BM
[N/P]
Former [2005/07]For all designated states
VistaPrint Technologies Limited
Canon's Court, 22 Victoria Street
Hamilton HM-12 / BM
Former [2004/41]For all designated states
VISTAPRINT TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED
Cedar House, 41 Cedar Avenue
Hamilton HM-12 / BM
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
Digital-Net, Inc.
Suite 100, 235 East 6th Street
St. Paul, MN 55101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JECHA, Steven
5253 Beard Avenue South
Minneapolis, MN 55410 / US
02 / MITCHELL, Winfield, A.
5109 28th Avenue South
Minneapolis, MN 55417 / US
[2000/40]
Representative(s)Fleuchaus, Michael A. , et al
Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Steinerstrasse 15/A
81369 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Fleuchaus, Michael A. , et al
Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 36
81479 München / DE
Former [2006/12]Fleuchaus, Michael A. , et al
Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42
D-81479 München / DE
Former [2000/40]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date98961846.701.12.1998
[2000/40]
WO1998US25474
Priority number, dateUS1997098243802.12.1997         Original published format: US 982438
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9928834
Date:10.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1040428
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1040428
Date:03.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/24, G06F17/21
[2000/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/40]
TitleGerman:ON-LINE DRUCKVORBEREITUNG[2000/40]
English:COMPUTERIZED PREPRESS[2000/40]
French:PREPRESSE INFORMATISEE[2000/40]
Entry into regional phase28.06.2000National basic fee paid 
28.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/40]
12.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.10.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
22.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2004Fee for grant paid
03.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04077461.4  / EP1496448
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.08.2005  24.08.2005  ADMISSIBLE
TechConsult Ltd. Büro Köln
Marsiliusstr. 11
50937 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Bungartz, Klaus Peter, et al
Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen
Im Mediapark 6A
50670 Köln / DE
 02  03.08.2005  24.08.2005  ADMISSIBLE
socoto gmbh & co.kg
Cläre-Prem-Strasse 3
54290 Trier / DE
Opponent's representative
Bungartz, Klaus Peter, et al
Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen
Im Mediapark 6A
50670 Köln / DE
 03  03.08.2005  24.08.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Peter Schmidt Group am Main GmbH
Westhafenplatz 8
60327 Frankfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Bungartz, Klaus Peter, et al
Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen
Im Mediapark 6A
50670 Köln / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/37]
Opponent(s)01  03.08.2005  24.08.2005  ADMISSIBLE
TechConsult Ltd. Büro Köln
Marsiliusstr. 11
50937 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Bungartz, Klaus Peter, et al
Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen Eupener Strasse 161a
50933 Köln / DE
 02  03.08.2005  24.08.2005  ADMISSIBLE
socoto gmbh & co.kg
Cläre-Prem-Strasse 3
54290 Trier / DE
Opponent's representative
Bungartz, Klaus Peter, et al
Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen Eupener Strasse 161a
50933 Köln / DE
 03  03.08.2005  24.08.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Peter Schmidt Group am Main GmbH
Westhafenplatz 8
60327 Frankfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Bungartz, Klaus Peter, et al
Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen Eupener Strasse 161a
50933 Köln / DE
Former [2008/43]
Opponent(s)01  03.08.2005  24.08.2005  ADMISSIBLE
TechConsult Ltd. Büro Köln
Marsiliusstr. 11
50937 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Bungartz, Klaus Peter, et al
Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen Eupener Strasse 161a
50933 Köln / DE
 02  03.08.2005  24.08.2005  ADMISSIBLE
socoto gmbh & co.kg
Cläre-Prem-Strasse 3
54290 Trier / DE
Opponent's representative
Bungartz, Klaus Peter, et al
Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen Eupener Strasse 161a
50933 Köln / DE
 03  03.08.2005  24.08.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Peter Schmidt Group am Main GmbH
Westhafenplatz 8
60327 Frankfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Bungartz, Klaus Peter, et al
Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen Eupener Strasse 161a
50933 Köln / DE
Former [2005/39]
Opponent(s)01  03.08.2005   
TechConsult Ltd. Büro Köln
Marsiliusstr. 11
50937 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Bungartz, Klaus Peter, et al
Bungartz Patentanwaltskanzlei Eupener Strasse 161a
50933 Köln / DE
 02  03.08.2005   
MediaCare GmbH & Co. KG
Cläre-Prem-Str. 3
54292 Trier / DE
Opponent's representative
Bungartz, Klaus Peter, et al
Bungartz Patentanwaltskanzlei Eupener Strasse 161a
50933 Köln / DE
 03  03.08.2005   
Peter Schmidt Group am Main GmbH
Westhafenplatz 8
60327 Frankfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Bungartz, Klaus Peter, et al
Bungartz Patentanwaltskanzlei Eupener Strasse 161a
50933 Köln / DE
07.09.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.03.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
25.06.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.06.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
25.01.2013Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/24]
Appeal following opposition24.08.2009Appeal received No.  T1726/09
05.11.2009Statement of grounds filed
25.01.2013Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
25.01.2013Date of oral proceedings
31.01.2013Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:22.11.2001Request for further processing filed
22.11.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.12.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.01.200204   M06   Fee paid on   07.01.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH03.11.2004
CY03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
LI03.11.2004
MC31.12.2004
LU03.01.2005
GR03.02.2005
PT03.04.2005
[2013/33]
Former [2008/16]CY03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
MC31.12.2004
LU03.01.2005
GR03.02.2005
PT03.04.2005
Former [2007/18]CY03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
MC31.12.2004
LU03.01.2005
GR03.02.2005
Former [2006/14]FI03.11.2004
MC31.12.2004
LU03.01.2005
GR03.02.2005
Former [2005/45]FI03.11.2004
MC31.12.2004
GR03.02.2005
Former [2005/26]FI03.11.2004
GR03.02.2005
Former [2005/24]FI03.11.2004
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0475734  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-44 * column 2, line 4 - column 2, line 54 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 35 *;
 [Y]EP0674277  (ADOBE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-44 * column 2, line 54 - column 4, line 30 * * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 3 * * figure 5 *;
 [XP]EP0814425  (SCITEX DIGITAL PRINTING INC [US]) [XP] 1-44 * abstract *;
 [XP]WO9804988  (MOORE BUSINESS FORMS INC [US]) [XP] 1-44 * abstract *