Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1054860

EP1054860 - PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF 1,3-DIOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.02.2008
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals
Pottery Road Dun Laoghaire
County Dublin / IE
[2007/17]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
Warner-Lambert Export Limited
Pottery Road
Dun Laoghaire, County Dublin / IE
Inventor(s)01 / McCABE, Richard, Joseph
16 East 29th Street
Holland, MI 49423 / US
02 / NANNINGA, Thomas, Norman
722 Winter Sun Place
Holland, MI 49424 / US
03 / BOSCH, Robert, Lee
10994 68th Avenue
Allendale, MI 49401 / US
04 / STAHL, Robert, Joseph
227 Little Station
Holland, MI 49424 / US
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Hayles, James Richard , et al
Pfizer
ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/26]Hayles, James Richard , et al
Pfizer Limited Patents Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich
Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
Former [2006/16]Hayles, James Richard , et al
Pfizer Limited European Patents Department, Ramsgate Road
Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
Former [2000/48]Tesch, Rudolf, Dr. , et al
Warner-Lambert Company, Legal Division, Patent Department, c/o Gödecke AG, Mooswaldallee 1
79090 Freiburg / DE
Application number, filing date98961855.802.12.1998
[2000/48]
WO1998US25493
Priority number, dateUS19970068193P19.12.1997         Original published format: US 68193 P
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9932434
Date:01.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1054860
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1054860
Date:25.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07C255/20, C07D207/34, C07B31/00
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/48]
Extension statesAL19.07.2000
LT19.07.2000
LV19.07.2000
MK19.07.2000
RO19.07.2000
SI19.07.2000
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 1,3-DIOLEN[2000/48]
English:PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF 1,3-DIOLS[2000/48]
French:PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE DE 1,3-DIOLS[2000/48]
Entry into regional phase19.07.2000National basic fee paid 
19.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
12.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
27.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2007Fee for grant paid
09.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.01.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
02.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
05.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC31.12.2007
[2008/33]
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0742209  (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-25 * Compound of formula (XIV) *;
 [DY]US4645854  (VERHOEVEN THOMAS R [US], et al) [DY] 1-25 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]  - M. SATO ET AL., "Aldol Reaction of 4-Trimethylsiloxy-6-methylene-1,3-dioxines with Chiral Aldehydes: Enantioselective Synthesis of 1,3-Dioxin-4-ones Having a 2,3-Dihydroxylated Alkyl Group at the 6-Position", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (1992), vol. 3, no. 9, pages 1157 - 1160, XP002091290 [Y] 1-25 * Scheme 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4166(00)82101-1
 [Y]  - J. E. LYNCH ET AL., "Synthesis of an HMG-CoA reductase inhibitor; a diastereoselective aldol approach", TETRAHEDRON. LETT., (1987), vol. 28, no. 13, pages 1385 - 1388, XP002027757 [Y] 1-25 * page 1386 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)95933-1
 [Y]  - M. SLETZINGER ET AL., "A diastereospecific, non-racemic synthesis of a novel beta-hydroxy-delta-lactone HMG-CoA reductase inhibitor", TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1985), vol. 26, no. 25, pages 2951 - 2954, XP002027758 [Y] 1-25 * page 2953 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)98589-7