Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1036393

EP1036393 - FLAT SURFACE-MOUNTED MULTI-PURPOSE WIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.11.2007
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NeWire, Inc.
c/o Baker Donelson 2200 Riverview Tower 900 South Gay Street
Knoxville, TN 37902 / US
[2006/50]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Sexton, Robert Jay
20506 Comfort Court
Ashburn, VA 20147 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sexton, Robert Jay
20506 Comfort Court
Ashburn, VA 20147 / US
 [2006/50]
Former [2000/38]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Bjerre, Nils Birger Johannes , et al
AWAPATENT AB, P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[2007/04]
Former [2000/38]Bjerre, Nils B.J.
AWAPATENT AB, P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date98961868.103.12.1998
[2000/38]
WO1998US25576
Priority number, dateUS1997098507904.12.1997         Original published format: US 985079
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9928917
Date:10.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1036393
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1036393
Date:24.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.06.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01B7/08, H01B7/00
[2002/33]
Former International [2000/38]H01B7/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
Extension statesRO04.07.2000
TitleGerman:MEHRZWECKFLACHKABEL FÜR OBERFLÄCHE-MONTAGE[2000/38]
English:FLAT SURFACE-MOUNTED MULTI-PURPOSE WIRE[2000/38]
French:CABLE MULTIFONCTION PLAT MONTE EN SURFACE[2000/38]
Entry into regional phase04.07.2000National basic fee paid 
04.07.2000Search fee paid 
04.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
19.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.2006Fee for grant paid
22.09.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
10.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
20.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
09.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
07.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2439512  (KABEL METALLWERKE GHH) [A] 1-14 * page 2, paragraph L - page 4, paragraph L; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB2252197  (REED COLIN JAMES, et al) [A] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph L; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO9639704  (SEXTON ROBERT JAY [US]) [A] 1-23 * page 6, line 1 - page 33, line L; figures 1-6 *
International search[Y]US5500489  (SHAH DINESH T [US], et al);
 [Y]US4355865  (CONRAD LEE R, et al);
 [Y]US2200776  (HOOVER VAINO A);
 [Y]US3168617  (RICHTER HERMAN W);
 [A]US5673352  (BAUER FRED HENRY [US], et al);
 [A]US4401361  (SLAUGHTER RAYMOND J [GB]);
 [A]US4185887  (FERRENTINO ANTONIO [IT])