Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1038199

EP1038199 - UNIVERSAL ENDOSCOPE VIDEO ADAPTOR WITH ZOOM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.02.2003  [2003/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Transamerican Technologies International doing business as TTI Medical
2246 Camino Ramon
San Ramon, CA 94583 / US
[2000/39]
Inventor(s)01 / HOWES, Allen, R.
4059 West Lakeshore Drive
San Ramon, CA 94583 / US
02 / LI, Shifang
5043 Rigatti Circle
Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date98961942.407.12.1998
[2000/39]
WO1998US25876
Priority number, dateUS1997098850210.12.1997         Original published format: US 988502
US1998020715707.12.1998         Original published format: US 207157
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9930198
Date:17.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1038199
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999
[2000/39]
Search report(s)International search reportUS17.06.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP07.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:G02B15/14, G02B23/24, G03B17/48, A61B1/04, A61B1/00
[2002/04]
Former International [2000/39]G02B15/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:UNIVERSELLER ENDOSKOPVIDEOADAPTER MIT ZOOM[2000/39]
English:UNIVERSAL ENDOSCOPE VIDEO ADAPTOR WITH ZOOM[2000/39]
French:ADAPTATEUR UNIVERSEL D'APPAREIL VIDEO A UN ENDOSCOPE, DOTE D'UN ZOOM[2000/39]
Entry into regional phase05.06.2000National basic fee paid 
05.06.2000Search fee paid 
05.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
12.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/09]
26.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0651272  (CANZEK ENDOSKOPIE [CH]) [X] 18-20 * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 53; figures 2,6 * * the whole document * [A] 1-17;
 [A]US4312572  (YAMASHITA NOBUO, et al) [A] 1-20 * column 6, line 28 - column 7, line 59; figures 1,4 *;
 [A]DE4444049  (WOLF GMBH RICHARD [DE]) [A] 1,12 * column 1, line 27 - column 2, line 13; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE3341876  (LEMKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,12 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1; figure 1 *
International search[Y]US5245475  (TAKASUGI YOSHIHARU [JP]);
 [Y]US5156141  (KREBS HELMUT [US], et al);
 [Y]US4969450  (CHINNOCK RANDAL B [US], et al);
 [Y]US5418645  (COATH PHILIP M [GB], et al)