EP1040105 - METHODS FOR THE ESTERIFICATION OF ALCOHOLS AND COMPOUNDS USEFUL THEREFOR AS POTENTIAL ANTICANCER AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emory University 2009 Ridgewood Drive Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states EMORY UNIVERSITY 2009 Ridgewood Drive Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIOTTA, Dennis, C. 251 Montrose Drive McDonough, GA 30253 / US | 02 /
VENKATESAN, Hariharan 10343 San Diego Mission Road Apt. D329 San Diego, CA 92108 / US | 03 /
CAPTAIN, Laura 5122-208 Copper Ridge Drive Durham, NC 27707 / US | 04 /
VORONKOV, Michael, V. Apartment 224,2220 South West 34th Street Gainesville, FL 32608 / US | 05 /
SNYDER, James, P. 1086 Rosedale Drive Atlanta, GA 30306 / US | 06 /
SCHESTOPOL, Marcus, A. 1228 Wynford Downs Marietta, GA 30064 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2001/10] | 01 /
LIOTTA, Dennis, C. 251 Montrose Drive McDonough, GA 30253 / US | ||
02 /
VENKATESAN, Hariharan 10343 San Diego Mission Road Apt.#D329 San Diego, CA 92108 / US | |||
03 /
CAPTAIN, Laura 5122-208 Copper Ridge Drive Durham, NC 27707 / US | |||
04 /
VORONKOV, Michael, V. Apartment 224,2220 South West 34th Street Gainesville, FL 32608 / US | |||
05 /
SNYDER, James, P. 1086 Rosedale Drive Atlanta, GA 30306 / US | |||
06 /
SCHESTOPOL, Marcus, A. 1228 Wynford Downs Marietta, GA 30064 / US | |||
Former [2000/40] | 01 /
LIOTTA, Dennis, C. 251 Montrose Drive McDonough, GA 30253 / US | ||
02 /
VENKATESAN, Hariharan 2809 E. Clairemont Road Atlanta, GA 30329 / US | |||
03 /
CAPTAIN, Laura 5122-208 Copper Ridge Drive Durham, NC 27707 / US | |||
04 /
VORONKOV, Michael, V. Apartment 224,2220 South West 34th Street Gainesville, FL 32608 / US | |||
05 /
SNYDER, James, P. 1086 Rosedale Drive Atlanta, GA 30306 / US | |||
06 /
SCHESTOPOL, Marcus, A. 1228 Wynford Downs Marietta, GA 30064 / US | Representative(s) | Leißler-Gerstl, Gabriele, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/19] | Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele, et al European Patent Attorney Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/40] | Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arnulfstrasse 25 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98962065.3 | 11.12.1998 | [2000/40] | WO1998US26341 | Priority number, date | US19970989590 | 12.12.1997 Original published format: US 989590 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9931079 | Date: | 24.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1040105 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D305/00 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
C07D263/16 (EP,US);
C07C229/34 (EP,US);
C07C35/37 (EP,US);
C07D263/26 (EP,US);
C07D277/14 (EP,US);
C07D305/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2000/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERESTERUNG VON ALCOHOLEN UND DAFÜR NÜTZBARE VERBINDUNGEN ALS POTENTIELLE ANTITUMORMITTEL | [2000/40] | English: | METHODS FOR THE ESTERIFICATION OF ALCOHOLS AND COMPOUNDS USEFUL THEREFOR AS POTENTIAL ANTICANCER AGENTS | [2000/40] | French: | PROCEDES D'ESTERIFICATION D'ALCOOLS ET DE COMPOSES S'UTILISANT COMME AGENTS ANTICANCEREUX POTENTIELS | [2000/40] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.07.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 26.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/53] | 12.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2696464 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR]) [A] 1,2,10,40,41 * page 1 - page 5; claims 1,4,7-12 *; | JPS80145650 [ ] (NIPPON KAYAKU CO.); | [A]WO9715562 (SERIPHARM [FR], et al) [A] 1,80 * examples 4,23-26; claims 1,12 *; | [A]WO9700870 (PHARMACIA & UPJOHN SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1,2,10,11,80 * page 5 - page 11; claims 1,4,7 *; | [PAX]US5773629 (YANG YUH-LIN ALLEN [TW], et al) [PA] 1,2,10 * column 1 - column 3; example 1 * * column 6 - column 7 * [X] 80; | [A]EP0561614 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 93 * claim - *; | [X] - J.LEGTERS ET AL., "SYNTHESIS OF BETA-AMINO A-HYDROXY CARBOXILIC ESTERS", RECUEIL DES TRAVAUX CHIMIQUES DES PAYS-BAS., AMSTERDAM NL, (19920202), vol. 111, pages 69 - 74, XP002099798 [X] 80 * page 69 - page 70; table 1 * | [DAX] - D.KINGSTON ET AL., "SYNTHESIS OF TAXOL FROM BACCATIN III", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS., OXFORD GB, (1994), vol. 35, no. 26, pages 4483 - 4484, XP002099799 [DA] 1 * page 4483 - page 4484 * [X] 80,81 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)60706-2 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1981), vol. 94, no. 25, Database accession no. 174679j, page 687, XP002099800 [X] 80 * abstract * | [A] - C.GENNARI ET AL., "TAXOL SEMISYNTHESIS", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., EASTON US, (1997), vol. 62, pages 4746 - 4755, XP000698595 [A] 1,78 * page 4748 - page 4749; figure 12; examples EXPER,12; tables SCH.2,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo9703212 | [A] - YOSHIMITSU NAGAO ET AL., "HIGHLY DIASTEREOSELECTIVE ALKYLATION OF CHIRAL TIN(II) ENOLATE ONTO CYCLIC ACYL IMINES.", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON., US, (1990), vol. 55, no. 4, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 1148 - 1156, XP002119274 [A] 120,125,131 * page 1148 - page 1150; figures 3B,F,5,7,13; table IA * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00291a012 |