Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037843

EP1037843 - METHOD FOR CUTTING OUT STREAMERS AND IMPLEMENTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.05.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spotising
Rue Robbrechts 234
1780 Wemmel / BE
[2000/39]
Inventor(s)01 / PERON, Philippe, Louis, Gilbert
Rue Robbrechts 234
B-1780 Wemmel / BE
02 / SCHLUMPF, Raymond, Jacques
Rue du Fort Debout 6
B-7620 Hollain / BE
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Claeys, Pierre , et al
Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Claeys, Pierre , et al
Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Patent Attorneys, Rue de Livourne 7
1060 Brussels / BE
Application number, filing date98962132.108.12.1998
[2000/39]
WO1998BE00196
Priority number, dateBE1997000099409.12.1997         Original published format: BE 9700994
[2000/39]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9929606
Date:17.06.1999
Language:FR
[1999/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1037843
Date:27.09.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037843
Date:02.07.2003
Language:FR
[2003/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65H37/04, B65H39/14
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON PLAKETTEN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS[2000/39]
English:METHOD FOR CUTTING OUT STREAMERS AND IMPLEMENTING DEVICE[2000/39]
French:PROCEDE DE DECOUPAGE D'AFFICHES ET DISPOSITIF POUR SA MISE EN OEUVRE[2000/39]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2000National basic fee paid 
27.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
19.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
07.11.2002Fee for grant paid
07.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26]
Request for further processing for:07.11.2002Request for further processing filed
07.11.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.11.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200205   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.07.2003
FI02.07.2003
NL02.07.2003
DK02.10.2003
GR02.10.2003
PT02.10.2003
SE02.10.2003
DE03.10.2003
LU08.12.2003
[2005/23]
Former [2004/31]AT02.07.2003
FI02.07.2003
NL02.07.2003
DK02.10.2003
GR02.10.2003
PT02.10.2003
SE02.10.2003
DE03.10.2003
Former [2004/29]AT02.07.2003
FI02.07.2003
NL02.07.2003
DK02.10.2003
GR02.10.2003
PT02.10.2003
SE02.10.2003
Former [2004/16]AT02.07.2003
FI02.07.2003
NL02.07.2003
GR02.10.2003
PT02.10.2003
SE02.10.2003
Former [2004/14]AT02.07.2003
FI02.07.2003
NL02.07.2003
GR02.10.2003
PT02.10.2003
Former [2004/13]FI02.07.2003
NL02.07.2003
PT02.10.2003
Former [2004/12]FI02.07.2003
NL02.07.2003
Former [2004/10]NL02.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9113424  (MEDIAS ACTUELS SA [FR], et al) [DA] 1,7 * the whole document *;
 [DA]FR2631577  (DANGOISSE JEAN PAUL [FR]) [DA] 1,7 * the whole document *