Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034520

EP1034520 - ANTI-THEFT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.11.2003
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Meto International GmbH
Ersheimer Strasse 69
69434 Hirschhorn/Neckar / DE
[2000/37]
Inventor(s)01 / BREMER, Peter
Zum Roten Wasser 20
D-64743 Beerfelden / DE
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Menges, Rolf , et al
Ackmann Menges
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 14 04 31
80454 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/30]Menges, Rolf , et al
Ackmann Menges Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 14 04 31
80454 München / DE
Former [2000/37]Menges, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Ackmann, Menges & Demski, Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 31
80454 München / DE
Application number, filing date98962321.004.11.1998
[2000/37]
WO1998EP07043
Priority number, dateDE199715250627.11.1997         Original published format: DE 19752506
[2000/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9928878
Date:10.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1034520
Date:13.09.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1034520
Date:22.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:G08B13/24
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/37]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR SICHERUNG VON ARTIKELN GEGEN DIEBSTAHL[2000/37]
English:ANTI-THEFT SYSTEM[2000/37]
French:SYSTEME ANTIVOL POUR ARTICLES[2000/37]
Entry into regional phase11.05.2000National basic fee paid 
11.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
21.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2002Fee for grant paid
02.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
11.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR22.01.2003
GB22.01.2003
IT22.01.2003
NL22.01.2003
DK22.04.2003
SE22.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]FR22.01.2003
GB22.01.2003
NL22.01.2003
DK22.04.2003
SE22.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/22]GB22.01.2003
NL22.01.2003
DK22.04.2003
SE22.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/04]NL22.01.2003
DK22.04.2003
SE22.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/02]NL22.01.2003
DK22.04.2003
SE22.04.2003
Former [2003/41]NL22.01.2003
SE22.04.2003
Former [2003/30]SE22.04.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]US3838409  (MINASY A, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 20 - line 42; figure 1 *;
 [AD]EP0611164  (ESSELTE METO INT GMBH [DE]) [AD] 5,6 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0352513  (KNOGO CORP [US]) [A] 11 * column 7, line 43 - line 47 *;
 [AD]EP0123586  (FAIRCHILD CAMERA INSTR CO [US]) [AD] 5,6 * abstract *