EP1032548 - PLANT GRANULATE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harzmann-Optima Marketing- und Vertriebs GmbH Am Birkenstock 19 72505 Krauchenwies-Göggingen / DE | [2000/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENNEBERG, Martin Am Hofäcker 27 D-88605 Me kirch / DE | 02 /
HARTMANN, Rudolf Am Birkenstock 16 D-72505 Krauchenwies / DE | 03 /
WILD, Kurt Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 4 D-78194 Immendingen / DE | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Tomerius, Isabel, Dr., et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Postfach 151324 80048 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/36] | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Patentanwälte Weber & Heim Bavariaring 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98962345.9 | 16.11.1998 | [2000/36] | WO1998EP07320 | Priority number, date | DE19971050951 | 17.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19750951 | DE19971050952 | 17.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19750952 | [2000/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9925665 | Date: | 27.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1032548 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1032548 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C05D9/00, C05D3/02 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
C05D3/02 (EP,US);
C05D9/00 (EP);
C05G5/12 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C05D3/02, C05D9/00, C05F7/00, C05F11/00, C05G5/40 (US,EP);
C05D9/00, C05F7/00, C05F11/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [2000/36] | Title | German: | PFLANZGRANULAT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2000/36] | English: | PLANT GRANULATE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2000/36] | French: | GRANULES VEGETAUX ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE LES PREPARER | [2000/36] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 27.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 04.09.2002 | [2008/16] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0259608 (GFR GES AUFBEREIT RESTSTOFF [DE]) [A] 1-17,26-32 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0314159 (KOVINOTEHNA CELJE N SOL O TOZD [YU]) [A] 1-17,26-32* the whole document *; | [A]US4939372 (SCHVOERER MAX [FR], et al) [A] 1,19-25 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2663257 (MANCHON OLIVIER [FR]) [X] 1-7,9 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0476550 (PRO MINERAL GES [DE]) [X] 1-9,11,12,16-18,26-32 * claim - * * column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 26 *; | [X]WO9212623 (ROCKWOOL GRODAN BV [NL]) [X] 1-3,5-8,11,26-32 * claim - * * page 2, line 7 - page 3, line 30 * * examples 2,4 *; | [X]WO9507384 (MARCAL PAPER MILLS INC [US]) [X] 1-7,10,11,13-17,26-32 * claim - * * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 20 *; | [X]EP0649826 (HOCHWALD TON GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,12,13,16,17,26-32 * claim - * * column 2, line 4 - column 4, line 35 *; | [X]EP0747526 (MARCAL PAPER MILLS INC [US]) [X] 1-7,10-12,14,16,17,26-32 * claim - * * column 3, line 53 - column 11, line 10 * |