Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032520

EP1032520 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTROMECHANICALLY ACTUATED PARKING BRAKE FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BÖHM, Jürgen
Im Bangert 8
D-65558 Oberneisen / DE
[2000/36]
Application number, filing date98962370.720.11.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998EP07467
Priority number, dateDE199715190422.11.1997         Original published format: DE 19751904
[2000/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9926829
Date:03.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032520
Date:06.09.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1032520
Date:08.05.2002
Language:DE
[2002/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60T13/74
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/36]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ANSTEUERUNG EINER ELEKTROMECHANISCH BETÄTIGBAREN FESTSTELLBREMSE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE[2000/36]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTROMECHANICALLY ACTUATED PARKING BRAKE FOR MOTOR VEHICLES[2000/36]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE COMMANDE D'UN FREIN DE STATIONNEMENT A ACTIONNEMENT ELECTROMECANIQUE POUR VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase23.06.2000National basic fee paid 
23.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
09.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2002Fee for grant paid
25.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Former [2004/22]GB20.11.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]DE19536694  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19526645  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE])