Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034104

EP1034104 - ELECTROMECHANICAL BRAKE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.11.2001
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2002  [2002/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BÖHM, Jürgen
Kaltenbachstrasse 2
D-65558 Oberneisen / DE
02 / STÖLZL, Stefan
Schafackerweg 3
D-69469 Weinheim / DE
03 / WILLIMOWSKI, Peter
Eichenweg 41
D-63486 Bruchköbel / DE
04 / NELL, Joachim
Humboldweg 1
D-63454 Hanau / DE
05 / OEHLER, Rainer
Jahnstrasse 25
D-64285 Darmstadt / DE
[2000/37]
Application number, filing date98962372.320.11.1998
[2000/37]
WO1998EP07470
Priority number, dateDE199715190222.11.1997         Original published format: DE 19751902
DE199812912630.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19829126
[2000/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9926821
Date:03.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1034104
Date:13.09.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999
[2000/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60T8/00, B60T7/04, B60T13/74, B60R16/02, G05B9/03, B60T13/66
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/37]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROMECHANISCHES BREMSSYSTEM[2000/37]
English:ELECTROMECHANICAL BRAKE SYSTEM[2000/37]
French:SYSTEME DE FREINAGE ELECTROMECANIQUE[2000/37]
Entry into regional phase12.11.1999National basic fee paid 
12.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.01.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
01.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
01.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/01]
04.07.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/01]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.10.1999AT   M01   Not yet paid
08.10.1999BE   M01   Not yet paid
08.10.1999CH   M01   Not yet paid
08.10.1999CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.10.1999DE   M01   Fee paid on   12.11.1999
08.10.1999DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.10.1999ES   M01   Not yet paid
08.10.1999FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.10.1999FR   M01   Fee paid on   12.11.1999
08.10.1999GB   M01   Fee paid on   12.11.1999
08.10.1999GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.10.1999IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.10.1999IT   M01   Fee paid on   12.11.1999
08.10.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.10.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.10.1999NL   M01   Not yet paid
08.10.1999PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.10.1999SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
24.01.2000M01   Fee paid on   01.02.2000
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]DE3504096  (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]) [A] 1,15 * page 5, line 13 - page 8, line 25; figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]WO9513946  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [DA] 1,15 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 7, line 15; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0519179  (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]) [A] 1,15 * column 2, line 29 - line 35 *;
 [A]DE3502100  (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]) [A] 1,15 * page 10, line 2 - page 13, line 18; figures 1,2 *;
 [PA]DE19732229  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PA] 1,15 * column 5, line 22 - column 8, line 55; figure 1 *