Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1040367

EP1040367 - METHOD OF STACKING SEISMIC TRACES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.04.2006
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.04.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.05.2006  [2006/21]
Applicant(s)For:DE  IT  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola / VG
For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]For:DE  IT  NL 
SCHLUMBERGER HOLDINGS LIMITED
P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola / VG
For:FR 
SERVICES PETROLIERS SCHLUMBERGER
42, rue Saint-Dominique
F-75007 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BAETEN, Guido, Josef, Maria
37 Caledonian House, Barnfield Road
Crawley, West Sussex RH10 2DN / GB
[2000/40]
Representative(s)Stoole, Brian David
Geco-Prakla Technical Services Inc, Patent Department Schlumberger House Buckingham Gate Gatwick
West Sussex RH6 0NZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]Stoole, Brian David
Geco-Prakla Technical Services Inc, Patent Department, Schlumberger House, Buckingham Gate
Gatwick, West Sussex RH6 0NZ / GB
Application number, filing date98962557.918.12.1998
[2000/40]
WO1998GB03819
Priority number, dateGB1997002692819.12.1997         Original published format: GB 9726928
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9932903
Date:01.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1040367
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999
[2000/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01V1/36
[2000/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   NL [2000/40]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ANSAMMELN VON SEISMISCHEN SPUREN[2000/40]
English:METHOD OF STACKING SEISMIC TRACES[2000/40]
French:PROCEDE DE SOMMATION DE TRACES SISMIQUES[2000/40]
Entry into regional phase10.04.2000National basic fee paid 
10.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/40]
08.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/21]
28.12.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XA]OA2288  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC) [X] 1,2,13,14 * the whole document * * page 14, line 20 - page 16, line 12; figures 2-5; claim 5 * [A] 15,16;
 [PA]US5774417  (CORRIGAN DENNIS [US], et al) [PA] 1 * abstract * * column 12, line 38 - column 15, line 23 *;
 [PY]WO9822835  (GECO PRAKLA UK LTD [GB], et al) [PY] 5-7 * abstract *;
 [YA]US3622967  (FOSTER MANUS R, et al) [Y] 11 * abstract * [A] 4;
 [X]US5392213  (HOUSTON LOUIS M [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 8 - line 13 *
 [A]  - SCHOENBERGER M, "OPTIMUM WEIGHTED STACK FOR MULTIPLE SUPPRESSION", GEOPHYSICS, (19960501), vol. 61, no. 3, pages 891 - 901, XP000620778 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.1444014
 [XY]  - MOINI S ET AL, "USE OF FREQUENCY DOMAIN ANALYSIS FOR SIGNAL-TO-NOISE RATIO ENHANCEMENT IN STACKING", MULTIDIMENSIONAL SIGNAL PROCESSING, AUDIO AND ELECTROACOUSTICS, GLASGOW, MAY 23 - 26, 1989, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19890523), vol. 3, no. CONF. 14, pages 1583 - 1585, XP000089170 [X] 1 * the whole document * ** concluding remarks ** [Y] 5-7,11