Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1042318

EP1042318 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF PAROXETINE HYDROCHLORIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.11.2002
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2003  [2003/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC
New Horizons Court Brentford
Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC
New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / WARD, Neal SmithKline Beecham Pharmaceuticals
Old Powder Mills, Near Leigh
Tonbridge Kent TN11 9AN / GB
02 / JONES, Alan, D. SmithKline Beecham Pharmaceuticals
Old Powder Mills Near Leigh
Tonbridge, Kent TN11 9AN / GB
[2000/41]
Representative(s)West, Vivien , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN9.25.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]West, Vivien , et al
SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Application number, filing date98962563.718.12.1998
[2000/41]
WO1998GB03836
Priority number, dateGB1997002690719.12.1997         Original published format: GB 9726907
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9932484
Date:01.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1042318
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999
[2000/41]
Search report(s)International search reportEP01.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07D405/12, A61K31/445
[2000/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/41]
Extension statesRO14.06.2000
SI14.06.2000
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PAROXETIN HYDROCHLORID[2000/41]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF PAROXETINE HYDROCHLORIDE[2000/41]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'HYDROCHLORURE DE PAROXETINE[2000/41]
Entry into regional phase14.06.2000National basic fee paid 
14.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
25.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/01]
22.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]CA2187128  (BRANTFORD CHEM INC [CA]) [X] 1-7 * page 2, line 6 - line 8; example 1 *;
 [XD]WO9624595  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [XD] 1,4-7 * page 1; examples 1-3; claim 16 * * page 6, line 5 - line 10 *;
 [AD]EP0223403  (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [AD] 1,5-7;
 [A]  - LYNCH, IAN R. ET AL, "Infrared spectroscopic studies on the solid state forms of paroxetine hydrochloride", ANAL. PROC. (LONDON) (1988), 25(9), 305-6 CODEN: ANPRDI;ISSN: 0144-557X, XP000572171 [A] 1,5-7
 [A]  - BUXTON P C ET AL, "SOLID-STATE FORMS OF PAROXETINE HYDROCHLORIDE", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, (19880101), vol. 42, pages 135 - 143, XP000572028 [A] 1,5-7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(88)90169-X