EP1045631 - PLANT SENESCENCE-ASSOCIATED GENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vitality Biotechnologies, Inc. Suite 214, 9175 Guilford Road Columbia, MD 21046 / US | [2000/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEPSTEIN, Shimon Einstein Building, Carmel Industrial Park 39101 Tirat Hacarmel / IL | 02 /
HAJUOJE, Taleb Einstein Building, Carmel Industrial Park 39101 Tirat Hacarmel / IL | 03 /
ROSNER, Amalia Einstein Building, Carmel Industrial Park 39101 Tirat Hacarmel / IL | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2003/19] |
Former [2000/43] | Olgemöller, Luitgard, Dr. Leonhard - Olgemöller - Fricke, Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 09 57 80083 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98962909.2 | 08.12.1998 | [2000/43] | WO1998US25799 | Priority number, date | US19970067898P | 08.12.1997 Original published format: US 67898 P | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9929159 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1045631 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A01H1/00, A01H5/00, C12N5/04, C12N5/14, C12N9/00, C12N15/29, C12N15/82 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
C12N15/8222 (EP);
C07K14/415 (EP);
C12N15/8249 (EP);
C12N15/8266 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Extension states | AL | 10.07.2000 | LT | 10.07.2000 | LV | 10.07.2000 | MK | 10.07.2000 | RO | 10.07.2000 | SI | 10.07.2000 | Title | German: | PFLANZLICHE GENE, DIE IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT SENESZENZ STEHEN | [2000/43] | English: | PLANT SENESCENCE-ASSOCIATED GENES | [2000/43] | French: | GENES ASSOCIES A LA SENESCENCE DES PLANTES | [2000/43] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.07.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 01.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/06] | 12.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.06.2002 | 31.12.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - SAKAI H, ET AL., "ETR2 IS AN ETR1-LIKE GENE INVOLVED IN ETHYLENE SIGNALING IN ARABIDOPSIS", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19980501), vol. 95, doi:10.1073/pnas.95.10.5812, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5812 - 5817, XP002918702 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.10.5812 | [X] - SCHALLER E, BLEECKER A B, "ETHYLENE-BINDING SITES GENERATED IN YEAST EXPRESSING THE ARABIDOPSIS ETR1 GENE", Science, American Association for the Advancement of Science, US, US, (19951215), vol. 270, doi:10.1126/science.270.5243.1809, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1809 - 1811, XP002918703 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.270.5243.1809 | [Y] - THEOLOGIS A, ET AL., "MODIFICATION OF FRUIT RIPENING BY SUPPRESSING GENE EXPRESSION", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY., AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD., US, US, (19920101), vol. 100, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 549 - 551, XP002918704 | [Y] - IZHAKI A, SHOSEYOV O, WEISS D, "A PETUNIA CDNA ENDCODING S-ADENOSYLMETHIONINE SYNTHETASE", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY., AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD., US, US, (19950101), vol. 108, doi:10.1104/pp.108.2.841, ISSN 0032-0889, page 841/842, XP002918705 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.108.2.841 | [Y] - GOMEZ-GOMEZ L, CARRASCO P, "HORMONAL REGULATION OF S-ADENOSYLMETHIONINE SYNTHASE TRANSCRIPTS INPEA OVARIES", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, SPRINGER, DORDRECHT., NL, NL, (19960101), vol. 30, no. 4, doi:10.1007/BF00019014, ISSN 0167-4412, pages 821 - 832, XP002918706 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00019014 |