Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037561

EP1037561 - SMART RECOGNITION APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.10.2014
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.12.2014  [2014/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covidien AG
Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
[2007/33]
Former [2005/33]For all designated states
Sherwood Services AG
Bahnhofstrasse 29
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Sherwood Services AG
Schwertstrasse 9
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
Inventor(s)01 / ORSZULAK, James, Henry
P.O. Box 245
Nederland, CO 80466 / US
02 / DOBBINS, Gary, Lee, Jr.
2098 Harvard Street
Longmont, CO 80503 / US
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98963045.410.12.1998
[2000/39]
WO1998US26272
Priority number, dateUS1997098836210.12.1997         Original published format: US 988362
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9929244
Date:17.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1037561
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999
[2000/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.06.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/36
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2000/39]
TitleGerman:INTELLIGENTES ERKENNUNGSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN[2000/39]
English:SMART RECOGNITION APPARATUS AND METHOD[2000/39]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE RECONNAISSANCE INTELLIGENTE[2000/39]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2000National basic fee paid 
30.06.2000Search fee paid 
30.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
07.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/49]
31.07.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/49]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.01.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201316   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5681307  (MCMAHAN WILLIAM H [US]) [X] 1-7,20,21,30,31 * column 4, line 36 - line 41 * * column 5, line 9 - line 42 * * column 7, line 42 - column 8, line 32; figures 1-5 * [Y] 8-11,19,22-29;
 [Y]US5693042  (BOIARSKI ANTHONY A [US], et al) [Y] 8,11,19,22-29 * column 7, line 20 - column 8, line 21; figures 14-16 *;
 [X]EP0473987  (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,20,24,27,28 * column 3, line 37 - line 58; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0408160  (TOPCON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-7,20 * column 4, line 4 - line 23 *;
 [Y]US5400267  (DENEN DENNIS J [US], et al) [Y] 9-11,19,23 * column A; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE4339049  (ERBE ELEKTROMEDIZIN [DE]) [A] 1,11,19,20 * column A *
International search[A]US5605150  (RADONS STEPHEN W [US], et al);
 [A]US5342356  (ELLMAN ALAN G [US], et al);
 [A]US5157603  (SCHELLER GREGG D [US], et al)
by applicantUS5400267
 US5681307