blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1040263

EP1040263 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RELIEVING A DIFFERENTIAL PRESSURE ACROSS A GASEOUS FUEL ADMISSION VALVE OF A DUAL FUEL ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CATERPILLAR INC.
100 N.E. Adams Street
Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
CATERPILLAR INC.
100 Northeast Adams Street
Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BROWN, Scott, C.
Apt. 104, 3106 W. Willow Knolls
Peoria, IL 61614-8102 / US
02 / FISCHER, Jeffery, T.
11404 W. Grange Hall Road
Brimfield, IL 61517-9585 / US
03 / OHLSON, Eric, W.
16112 N. Centerville Road
Edelstein, IL 61526-9723 / US
04 / WILLI, Martin, L.
2419 Farmington Drive W.
Lafayette, IN 47905-7654 / US
 [2002/19]
Former [2000/40]01 / BROWN, Scott, C.
Apt. 104, 3106 W. Willow Knolnollls
Peoria, IL 61614-8102 / US
02 / FISCHER, Jeffery, T.
11404 W. Grange Hall Road
Brimfield, IL 61517-9585 / US
03 / OHLSON, Eric, W.
16112 N. Centerville Road
Edelstein, IL 61526-9723 / US
04 / WILLI, Martin, L.
2419 Farmington Drive W.
Lafayette, IN 47905-7654 / US
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/40]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing.
Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98963147.814.12.1998
[2000/40]
WO1998US26510
Priority number, dateUS1997099525419.12.1997         Original published format: US 995254
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9932774
Date:01.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1040263
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1040263
Date:08.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.07.1999
ClassificationIPC:F02D19/10
[2000/40]
CPC:
F02D19/0631 (EP,US); F02D19/022 (EP,US); F02D19/027 (EP,US);
F02D19/105 (EP,US); F02M21/0242 (EP,US); F02M21/0254 (EP,US);
F02M21/0266 (EP,US); Y02T10/30 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB [2000/40]
TitleGerman:METHODE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DRUCKENTLASTUNG EINES GASZUMESSVENTILS EINES ZWEIBRENNSTOFFMOTORS[2000/40]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RELIEVING A DIFFERENTIAL PRESSURE ACROSS A GASEOUS FUEL ADMISSION VALVE OF A DUAL FUEL ENGINE[2000/40]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DETENTE D'UNE PRESSION DIFFERENTIELLE DANS UNE SOUPAPE D'ADMISSION DE CARBURANT GAZEUX D'UN MOTEUR A DEUX CARBURANTS[2000/40]
Entry into regional phase19.07.2000National basic fee paid 
19.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/40]
21.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2002Fee for grant paid
19.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
01.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI08.05.2002
FR08.05.2002
[2006/14]
Former [2004/40]FI08.05.2002
FR17.01.2003
Former [2003/47]FR17.01.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0133777  (REID HARVEY MARSHALL [NZ]) [A] 1,8 * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 15, paragraph 1; figure 3 * * page 17, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]FR2441732  (TRANSPORTS ENTR CIE GLE FSE) [A] 1,8 * page 2, line 23 - line 29 * * page 4, line 24 - page 6, line 26; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9421911  (DAVIS FAMILY TRUST [US]);
 [A]WO9535441  (BIOCOM PTY LTD [AU], et al)
by applicantUS5398724
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.