Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0967969

EP0967969 - NOVEL ANTIOXIDANT MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, LU
published on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Color Access, Inc.
7 Corporate Center Drive Melville
New York 11747 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/39]For all designated states
Color Access, Inc.
7 Corporate Center Drive
Melville, New York 11747 / US
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Color Access, Inc.
7 Corporate Center Drive
Melville, New York 11747 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GUBERNICK, Joseph
3 East 71st Street
New York, NY 10021 / US
02 / MARENUS, Kenneth, D.
62 McCulloch Drive
Dix Hills, NY 11746 / US
03 / PELLE, Edward
140 Meyer Avenue
Valley Stream, NY 11580 / US
04 / DECLERCQ, Lieve
Poorthoflaan 77
B-2180 Ekeren / BE
05 / MAES, Daniel, H.
279A Nassau Road
Huntington, NY 11743 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Pochart, François
Cabinet Hirsch-Desrousseaux-Pochart
58, avenue Marceau
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Pochart, François
Cabinet Hirsch-Desrousseaux-Pochart, 34 rue de Bassano
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98963241.916.12.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998US26741
Priority number, dateUS1997099212817.12.1997         Original published format: US 992128
US1998001423227.01.1998         Original published format: US 14232
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9930682
Date:24.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967969
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0967969
Date:22.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/48
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:ANTIOXIDATIVE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2000/01]
English:NOVEL ANTIOXIDANT MIXTURE[2000/01]
French:MELANGE ANTIOXYDANT[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase17.09.1999National basic fee paid 
17.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
13.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.07.2004Fee for grant paid
19.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LU16.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
[2007/18]
Former [2005/45]FI22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2005/18]FI22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
Former [2005/11]FI22.09.2004
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9310755  (RICHARDSON VICKS INC [US]) [Y] 1-12 * page 1, lines 13-20; claims 1,8 *;
 [Y]JPS6127910  ;
 [Y]EP0659402  (INDENA SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1-3 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860621), vol. 010, no. 178, Database accession no. (C - 355), [Y] 1-12 * abstract *