Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1042382

EP1042382 - CYCLIC UREA-FORMALDEHYDE PREPOLYMER FOR USE IN PHENOL-FORMALDEHYDE AND MELAMINE-FORMALDEHYDE RESIN-BASED BINDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.06.2008  [2008/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEORGIA-PACIFIC RESINS, INC.
133 Peachtree Street N.E. Atlanta
GA 30348-5605 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
GEORGIA-PACIFIC RESINS, INC.
133 Peachtree Street N.E.
Atlanta, GA 30348-5605 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DUPRE, F., C.
313 Harden Street
Atlanta, GA 30312 / US
02 / FOUCHT, Millard, E.
5321 Greencastle Way
Stone Mountain, GA 30087 / US
03 / FREESE, William, P.
3283 Salem Lane
Conyers, GA 30013 / US
04 / GABRIELSON, Kurt, D.
1710 Lake Lucerne Road
Liburn, GA 30047 / US
05 / GAPUD, Benjamin, D.
750 Ashton Lane
Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US
06 / INGRAM, W., Hayes
1809 Highridge Drive
Conyers, GA 30094 / US
07 / McVAY, Ted, E.
710 Maggie Mae Lane
Lawrenceville, GA 30040 / US
08 / REDIGER, Richard, A.
2117 Flat Shoals Road
Conyers, GA 30094 / US
09 / SHOEMAKE, Kelly, A.
2032 Keswick Village
Conyers, GA 30013 / US
10 / TUTIN, Kim, K.
5037 Tanaga Court
Stone Mountain, GA 30087 / US
11 / WRIGHT, James, T.
904C Clubhouse Circle West
Decatur, GA 30032 / US
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Harrison, Ivor Stanley , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]Harrison, Ivor Stanley , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date98963255.918.12.1998
[2000/41]
WO1998US26922
Priority number, dateUS19970068286P19.12.1997         Original published format: US 68286 P
US19980095249P04.08.1998         Original published format: US 95249 P
US1998021574217.12.1998         Original published format: US 215742
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9932534
Date:01.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1042382
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999
[2000/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1042382
Date:23.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08G12/40, C08G14/12, C08L61/28, C08L61/06
[2000/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/41]
TitleGerman:CYCLISCHES HARNSTOFF-FORMALDEHYD PREPOLYMER ZUR VERWENDUNG IN BINDEMITTELN BASIEREND AUF PHENOL-FORMALDEHYD- UND MELAMIN-FORMALDEHYD-HARZEN[2002/23]
English:CYCLIC UREA-FORMALDEHYDE PREPOLYMER FOR USE IN PHENOL-FORMALDEHYDE AND MELAMINE-FORMALDEHYDE RESIN-BASED BINDERS[2000/41]
French:PREPOLYMERE UREE-FORMALDEHYDE CYCLIQUE S'UTILISANT DANS DES LIANTS A BASE DE RESINE PHENOL-FORMALDEHYDE ET MELAMINE-FORMALDEHYDE[2000/41]
Former [2000/41]CYCLISCHES HARNSTOFF-FORMALDEHYD PREPOLYMER ZUR VERWENDUNG IN BINDEMITTEL BASIEREND AUF PHENOL-FORMALDEHYD- UND MELAMIN-FORMALDEHYD-HARZEN
Entry into regional phase17.07.2000National basic fee paid 
17.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.07.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
25.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.2002Fee for grant paid
03.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR23.04.2003
PT23.07.2003
[2008/24]
Former [2004/02]PT23.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH08109309  ;
 [X]JPH07118355
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 096, no. 008, [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 095, no. 008, [X] 1,5 * abstract *