Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1048064

EP1048064 - ETCHING METHODS FOR ANISOTROPIC PLATINUM PROFILE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
3050 Bowers Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
3050 Bowers Avenue
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HWANG, Jeng, H.
20835 Scofield Drive
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date98963259.117.12.1998
[2000/44]
WO1998US26941
Priority number, dateUS1998000609213.01.1998         Original published format: US 6092
[2000/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9936956
Date:22.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1048064
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999
[2000/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/3205, H01L21/3213, C23F4/00
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/44]
TitleGerman:ÄTZMETHODEN FÜR ANISOTROPES PLATIN-ÄTZPROFIL[2000/44]
English:ETCHING METHODS FOR ANISOTROPIC PLATINUM PROFILE[2000/44]
French:PROCEDES SERVANT A GRAVER UN PROFIL DE PLATINE ANISOTROPE[2000/44]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2000National basic fee paid 
17.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.07.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
01.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/01]
04.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
06.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0725430  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [A] 1,5,27,35,36,39,47,59,67,68,76,80 * column 2, line 33 - line 55 * * column 4, line 16 - column 5, line 35; claims 4-7 *;
 [A]US5515984  (YOKOYAMA SEIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,7,13,18,19,27-30,33,38,47,48,59 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5679213  (NOSHIRO HIDEYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-3,5,6,19,21,27,28,34-40,47,51,52,59,68,76,77,91-93 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0786805  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [A] 7,10-13,29,30,32,48,50,59,68 * column 3, line 7 - line 56 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 27; figures 1A-1E *;
 [XA]  - HEE SEUP LEE ET AL, "Patterning of Pt thin films using SiO/sub 2/ mask in a high density plasma", JOURNAL OF THE KOREAN INSTITUTE OF TELEMATICS AND ELECTRONICS, MARCH 1997, KOREA INST. TELEMATICS & ELECTRON, SOUTH KOREA, ISSN 1016-135X, vol. 34D, no. 3, pages 87 - 92, XP002101109 [X] 1,5,7,9,18-21,24,27-29,33,35,36,38-40,44,91,92 * abstract * * page 88, column 2, paragraphs 2-3 * * page 89, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 90, column 2, paragraph 2; figure 2 * [A] 47,52,56,59,63,67,68,72,76,80,84-86,89
 [XA]  - KWANG-HO KWON ET AL, "The study on the etching mechanism of Pt thin film by inductive coupled plasma", JOURNAL OF THE KOREAN INSTITUTE OF TELEMATICS AND ELECTRONICS, JUNE 1997, KOREA INST. TELEMATICS & ELECTRON, SOUTH KOREA, ISSN 1016-135X, vol. 34D, no. 6, pages 27 - 32, XP002100985 [X] 91 * abstract * * page 452, column 2, line 5 - line 9; figures 1,6,7 * [A] 1,5,18-21,27,28,33,35,36,38-40,47,52,59,68,76,92
 [A]  - KEIL D ET AL, "The etching of platinum electrodes for PZT based ferroelectric devices", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ELEVENTH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PLASMA PROCESSING, PROCEEDINGS OF PLASMA PROCESSING XI (ISBN 1 56677 164 1), LOS ANGELES, CA, USA, 5-10 MAY 1996, 1996, Pennington, NJ, USA, Electrochem. Soc, USA, pages 515 - 521, XP002100986 [A] 81-90 * the whole document *