Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1042554

EP1042554 - REMOVABLE DOCTOR BLADE HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.03.2004  [2004/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kadant Web Systems Inc.
35 Sword Street
Auburn, MA 01501-0269 / US
[2003/02]
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
Thermo Web Systems, Inc.
P.O. Box 269, 35 Sword Street
Auburn, MA 01501 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GOODNOW, Ronald, F.
6 Fairview Drive
Leicester, MA 01524 / US
02 / REID, Robert, A.
13 Stevens P.k. Road
Charlton City, MA 01508 / US
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Barnard, Eric Edward
Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]Barnard, Eric Edward
BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn
London WC1V 6SE / GB
Application number, filing date98963263.318.12.1998
[2000/41]
WO1998US26954
Priority number, dateUS19970068463P22.12.1997         Original published format: US 68463 P
US1998021056614.12.1998         Original published format: US 210566
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9932717
Date:01.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1042554
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999
[2000/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1042554
Date:12.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:D21G3/00
[2000/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/41]
TitleGerman:ABNEHMBARE RAKELHALTERUNG[2000/41]
English:REMOVABLE DOCTOR BLADE HOLDER[2000/41]
French:PORTE-RACLE AMOVIBLE[2000/41]
Entry into regional phase08.06.2000National basic fee paid 
08.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
26.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
25.07.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
08.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2002Fee for grant paid
13.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0294992  (THERMO ELECTRON WEB SYST INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * column A; figure - * * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 14 * * column 8, line 42 - line 58 * [A] 8;
 [A]EP0485597  (AIKAWA TEKKO [JP]) [A] 1,8 * column A; figure - *