Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033925

EP1033925 - DEVICE FOR REMOVING EYELETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  16.09.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2005Opposition rejectedpublished on 02.11.2005  [2005/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Frey, Helmut
Birkenweg 16
66333 Völklingen / DE
[2000/37]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Vièl, Christof , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Vièl & Wieske PartGmbB
Postfach 65 04 03
66143 Saarbrücken / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/37]Vièl, Christof, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Viel & Wieske Postfach 65 04 03
66143 Saarbrücken / DE
Former [2001/34](deleted)
...
Former [2000/37]Schulz, Rütger, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date98963322.705.11.1998
[2000/37]
WO1998DE03221
Priority number, dateDE199715196024.11.1997         Original published format: DE 19751960
[2000/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9926506
Date:03.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1033925
Date:13.09.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1033925
Date:10.07.2002
Language:DE
[2002/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:A43D100/14, A41H37/02
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
Extension statesLT11.05.2000
LV11.05.2000
SI11.05.2000
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTFERNEN VON ÖSEN[2000/37]
English:DEVICE FOR REMOVING EYELETS[2000/37]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR ENLEVER DES OEILLETS[2000/37]
Entry into regional phase11.05.2000National basic fee paid 
11.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
15.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2002Fee for grant paid
10.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.04.2003   
William Prym GmbH & Co. KG
Zweifaller Strasse 130
D-52224 Stolberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Mentzel, Norbert, et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse
Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel
Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig
Kleiner Werth 34
42275 Wuppertal / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2003/23]
Opponent(s)01  08.04.2003   
William Prym GmbH & Co. KG
Zweifaller Strasse 130
D-52224 Stolberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Mentzel, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys., et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse, Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel, Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig, Kleiner Werth 34
42275 Wuppertal / DE
22.05.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.11.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.05.2005Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
03.06.2005Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2005/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US4780945  (RUTGERSSON GOERAN [SE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE215403  (ERLING) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB251773  (SIDNEY JOHN HILLMAN) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE3216179  (PRYM WERKE WILLIAM [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4757589  (NAKANO KATSUFUMI [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [DA]DE3633539  (PRYM WERKE WILLIAM [DE]) [DA] 1,9,10 * column 7, line 26 - line 31; figure - *
by applicantDE3633539
 DE9315550U
 EP0655205
 DE3216179