Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1040556

EP1040556 - ELECTRICAL CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR TRANSFORMING MAGNETIC FIELD ENERGY INTO ELECTRIC FIELD ENERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.05.2002
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.06.2002  [2002/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SiCED Electronics Development GmbH & Co KG
Paul-Gossen-Strasse 100
91052 Erlangen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
Siced Electronics Development GmbH & Co. Kg
Paul-Gossen-Strasse 100
91052 Erlangen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MITLEHNER, Heinz
Danziger Strasse 1 a
D-91080 Uttenreuth / DE
02 / MUNZ, Dieter
Tilmann-Riemenschneider-Strasse 19
D-91315 Höchstadt / DE
03 / SCHMIDT, Richard
Hauptstrasse 33
D-91083 Baiersdorf / DE
04 / STEPHANI, Dietrich
Hans-Birkmayr-Strasse 7
D-91088 Bubenreuth / DE
[2000/40]
Application number, filing date98963391.208.12.1998
[2000/40]
WO1998DE03603
Priority number, dateDE199715687319.12.1997         Original published format: DE 19756873
[2000/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9933160
Date:01.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1040556
Date:04.10.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999
[2000/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02M3/10, H01L29/12, G05F1/46
[2000/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   SE [2000/40]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHE SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR TRANSFORMATION VON MAGNETISCHER FELDENERGIE IN ELEKTRISCHE FELDENERGIE[2000/40]
English:ELECTRICAL CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR TRANSFORMING MAGNETIC FIELD ENERGY INTO ELECTRIC FIELD ENERGY[2000/40]
French:CONFIGURATION DE CIRCUIT ELECTRIQUE DESTINEE A LA TRANSFORMATION D'ENERGIE DE CHAMP MAGNETIQUE EN ENERGIE DE CHAMP ELECTRIQUE[2000/40]
Entry into regional phase07.06.2000National basic fee paid 
07.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/40]
05.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/26]
22.01.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US5334853  (YODER MAX N [US]) [A] 1,3,5-8,13;
 [A]US5635412  (BALIGA BANTVAL J [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,13;
 [A]US5256888  (KANE ROBERT C [US]) [A] 9,10,13;
 [AP]US5821576  (SRIRAM SAPTHARISHI [US]) [AP] 1-3,6,8;
 [A]US4801859  (DISHNER BRYAN W [US]) [A] 1,5,7,9,11,12,14,16,17;
 [A]EP0396125  (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,5,7,9,11,12,18,19;
 [A]US4437146  (CARPENTER RALPH F [US]) [A] 1,16,20