EP1028889 - SEMI-SUBMERSIBLE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Sofitech N.V. Rue de Stalle 140 1180 Bruxelles / BE | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
LI
Sofitech N.V. Rue de Stalle 140 1180 Brussels / BE | ||
For:FR
SERVICES PETROLIERS SCHLUMBERGER 42, rue Saint-Dominique F-75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORVAN, Pierre 34, quai Louis Bleriot F-75016 Paris / FR | 02 /
KOZICZ, John, Richard 16, allée de la Roseraie F-78870 Bailly / FR | 03 /
TITREVILLE, Bernard 42, rue des Renateaux F-78930 Breuil Bois Robert / FR | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Ede, Eric, et al Fitzpatricks 1 Blythswood Square Glasgow G2 4AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Ede, Eric, et al Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 98963464.7 | 13.11.1998 | [2000/34] | WO1998EP07336 | Priority number, date | GB19970024064 | 15.11.1997 Original published format: GB 9724064 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9925607 | Date: | 27.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1028889 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B63B1/10, B63H21/12, B63H21/32, B63J2/06, // B63B35:44 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
B63J2/06 (EP);
B63B1/107 (EP);
B63B35/4413 (EP);
B63H21/12 (EP);
B63H21/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/34] | Title | German: | HALBTAUCHER | [2000/34] | English: | SEMI-SUBMERSIBLE STRUCTURE | [2000/34] | French: | STRUCTURE SEMI-SUBMERSIBLE | [2000/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 06.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB2159114 (WORLEY ENG) [X] 1-4,6,15 * figures 1-5; claim 9 * * page 2, line 18 - line 45 * [Y] 16; | [XY]US3874314 (SANDERS JOHN P) [X] 1,2,6,7,15 * abstract * * column 2, line 26 - line 49 * [Y] 4,8-12,14; | [YA]DE2421150 (ERNO RAUMFAHRTTECHNIK GMBH) [Y] 16 * figure 2; claim 1 * * page 6, line 20 - line 29 * [A] 1,8; | [XA]US3556033 (BONNAFOUS GUY) [X] 1,2,5,8 * figures 3,4 * * column 5, line 47 - line 52 * [A] 16; | [YA] - GABLER U, Lecture "Sonderschiffbau", University of Hamburg, Winter Term 1972/73 (November 1972), Manuscript, Drawing 1.2. "Schem. Darstellung eines U-Bootes", XP002097431 [Y] 4 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,5-8,11,13 | [Y] - DREWS G, "Schiffslüftung und Warmluftheizung", HANDBUCH DER WERFTEN, Hamburg DE, (1967), vol. 9, pages 158 - 163, XP002097430 [Y] 8-12,14 * page 158, line 11 - line 47 * | [A] - HENSCHKE W (ED.), Schiffbautechnisches Handbuch, Band 4, BERLIN DD, VEB VERLAG TECHNIK, (1968), XP002097432 [A] 7 * 5.033 Kühlmittel; page 318 - page 319 * | [A] - HENSCHKE W (ED.), Schiffbautechnisches Handbuch, Band 4, BERLIN DD, VEB VERLAG TECHNIK, (1968), XP002097433 [A] 15 * 5.041 Kraftstoffversorgung; page 319 - page 323 * | by applicant | GB19970024063 |