Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032839

EP1032839 - APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATIC IMPLEMENTATION OF THE PCR METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/36]METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC IMPLEMENTATION OF CHEMICAL OR BIOLOGICAL METHODS
[2000/42]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  22.09.2006
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2006Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 25.10.2006  [2006/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2006/04]For all designated states
F.HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
MWG -Biotech AG
Anzinger Strasse 7
85560 Ebersberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HEIMBERG, Wolfgang
Böhmerwaldstrasse 72
D-85560 Ebersberg / DE
02 / WEICHSELGARTNER, Michael
Im Tal 77
D-85560 Ebersberg / DE
03 / GREBER, Martin
Dr.-Wintrich-Ring 33
D-85560 Ebersberg / DE
04 / KUTSCH, Peter
Hoppenbichlerstrasse 24
D-83022 Rosenheim / DE
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Ganahl, Bernhard , et al
Huber & Schüssler
Patentanwälte
Truderinger Strasse 246
81825 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/51]Ganahl, Bernhard , et al
Huber & Schüssler Patentanwälte Truderinger Strasse 246
81825 München / DE
Former [2000/36]Ganahl, Bernhard , et al
Reinhardt Söllner Ganahl, Hausen 5b
85551 Kirchheim b. München / DE
Application number, filing date98963486.019.11.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998EP07423
Priority number, dateDE1997220432U19.11.1997         Original published format: DE 29720432 U
[2000/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9926070
Date:27.05.1999
Language:DE
[1999/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1032839
Date:06.09.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1032839
Date:09.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/19]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1032839
Date:25.10.2006
Language:DE
[2006/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2006/24]
Former International [2000/36]G01N35/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/36]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN DURCHFÜHREN DES PCR-VERFAHRENS[2006/24]
English:APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATIC IMPLEMENTATION OF THE PCR METHOD[2006/24]
French:SYSTEME DE MISE EN OEUVRE AUTOMATIQUE DU PROCÉDÉ PCR[2006/24]
Former [2000/36]VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN DURCHFÜHREN VON CHEMISCHEN BZW. BIOLOGISCHEN VERFAHREN
Former [2000/36]METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC IMPLEMENTATION OF CHEMICAL OR BIOLOGICAL METHODS
Former [2000/36]SYSTEME DE MISE EN OEUVRE AUTOMATIQUE DE PROCEDES CHIMIQUES ET BIOLOGIQUES
Entry into regional phase23.09.1999National basic fee paid 
23.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/36]
23.09.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
10.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.10.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
06.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2000Fee for grant paid
13.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.02.2002  28.02.2002  WITHDRAWN
Eppendorf AG
Barkhausenweg 1
22339 HAMBURG / DE
Opponent's representative
Emmel, Thomas
Schaefer Emmel Hausfeld
Patentanwälte
Krohnstieg 43
22415 Hamburg / DE
 02  11.02.2002  06.03.2002  WITHDRAWN
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Ventocilla, Abraham
Ventocilla Patent AG
Burgstrasse 8
4107 Ettingen / CH
 [N/P]
Former [2006/01]
Opponent(s)01  07.02.2002  28.02.2002  WITHDRAWN
Eppendorf AG
Barkhausenweg 1
22339 HAMBURG / DE
Opponent's representative
Emmel, Thomas
Schaefer Emmel Hausfeld Patentanwälte Gehölzweg 20
22043 Hamburg / DE
 02  11.02.2002  06.03.2002  WITHDRAWN
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Ventocilla, Abraham
Ventocilla Patent AG Burgstrasse 8
4107 Ettingen / CH
Former [2005/49]
Opponent(s)01  07.02.2002  28.02.2002  WITHDRAWN
Eppendorf AG
Barkhausenweg 1
22339 HAMBURG / DE
Opponent's representative
Emmel, Thomas
Schaefer Emmel Hausfeld Patentanwälte Gehölzweg 20
22043 Hamburg / DE
 02  11.02.2002  06.03.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Ventocilla, Abraham
Ventocilla Patent AG Burgstrasse 8
4107 Ettingen / CH
Former [2002/14]
Opponent(s)01  07.02.2002   
Eppendorf AG
Barkhausenweg 1
22339 HAMBURG / DE
Opponent's representative
Emmel, Thomas, Dipl.-Biol., Dr.
Schaefer & Emmel, Gehölzweg 20
22043 Hamburg / DE
 02  11.02.2002   
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Ventocilla, Abraham
Ventocilla Patent AG Burgstrasse 8
4107 Ettingen / CH
13.03.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.08.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M05)
21.02.2005Reply to a communication from the opposition division
18.10.2005Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.10.2005Date of oral proceedings
31.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
31.10.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.11.2005Reply to a communication from the opposition division
29.12.2005Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.05.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
19.07.2006Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US5443791  (CATHCART G RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-12;
 [A]DE4412286  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12;
 [A]EP0201184  (CETUS CORP [US]) [A] 1