EP1042527 - COATED CEMENTED CARBIDE CUTTING TOOL AND METHOD OF COATING IT WITH DIAMOND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Aktiebolag (publ) 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [2000/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIKUS, Marian lgrytevägen 226 S-127 30 Skärholmen / SE | 02 /
REINECK, Ingrid Ripvägen 3 S-141 72 Huddinge / SE | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel Sandvik AB Patent Department 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Taquist, Lennart Sandvik AB Patent Department 811 81 SANDVIKEN / SE | Application number, filing date | 98963732.7 | 18.12.1998 | [2000/41] | WO1998SE02381 | Priority number, date | SE19970004742 | 18.12.1997 Original published format: SE 9704742 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9931292 | Date: | 24.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1042527 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1042527 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/02, C23C16/26, C23C14/02, C23C30/00 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
C23C30/005 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/0218 (EP,KR,US);
B23B27/148 (KR);
C23C16/27 (EP,KR,US);
B23B2228/04 (KR);
Y10T428/252 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2000/41] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETES SCHNEIDWERKZEUG AUS ZEMENTIERTEM KARBID UND VERFAHREN ZUM BESCHICHTEN DESSELBEN MIT DIAMANT | [2000/41] | English: | COATED CEMENTED CARBIDE CUTTING TOOL AND METHOD OF COATING IT WITH DIAMOND | [2000/41] | French: | OUTIL DE COUPE EN CARBURE FRITTE MUNI D'UN REVETEMENT ET PROCEDE DE FORMATION D'UN REVETEMENT EN DIAMANTS POUR CET OUTIL | [2000/41] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 02.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 17.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4843039 (AKESSON LEIF A E [SE], et al); | [X]US5100703 (SAIJO KOSUKE [JP], et al); | [A]WO9512009 (BALZERS HOCHVAKUUM [LI], et al); | [A]EP0701006 (SAINT GOBAIN NORTON IND CERAMI [US]); | [X]EP0759480 (TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO LTD [JP]) |