Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015917

EP1015917 - TRANSPARENT METALLO-DIELECTRIC PHOTONIC BAND GAP STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.10.2004  [2004/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Scalora, Michael
15037 Ashmont Circle
Huntsville, AL 35803 / US
[2000/27]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Skone James, Robert Edmund
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Skone James, Robert Edmund
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date98963736.816.09.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998US19129
Priority number, dateUS1997093175616.09.1997         Original published format: US 931756
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9915922
Date:01.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1015917
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:G02B5/20, G02B6/12
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:TRANSPARENTE METALLDIELEKTRISCHE PHOTONISCHE BANDLÜCKENSTRUKTUR[2000/27]
English:TRANSPARENT METALLO-DIELECTRIC PHOTONIC BAND GAP STRUCTURE[2000/27]
French:STRUCTURE A LARGEUR DE BANDE INTERDITE PHOTONIQUE METALLO-DIELECTRIQUE TRANSPARENTE[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2000National basic fee paid 
27.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
18.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/41]
05.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200104   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.2001
30.09.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US5559825  (SCALORA MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1,24,25,28,32 * column A; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US5440421  (FAN SHANHUI [US], et al) [A] 1,24,25,28,32 * column A; figures 1-3B *;
 [A]WO9611516  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1,24,25,28,32 * abstract *;
 [A]US5406573  (OZBAY EKMEL [US], et al) [A] 1,24,25,28,32 * column A; figures 1-25 *;
 [PA]US5740287  (SCALORA MICHAEL [US], et al) [PA] 1,24,25,28,32 * column A; figures 1-13 *;
 [PA]US5751466  (DOWLING JONATHAN P [US], et al) [PA] 1,24,25,28,32 * column A; figures 1-9B *