Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0983596

EP0983596 - CURRENT AND TRANSIENT VOLTAGE PROTECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 19.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE SIEMON COMPANY
76 Westbury Park Road
Watertown, CT 06795 / US
[2000/10]
Inventor(s)01 / VIKLUND, Mark
2 Waramaug Lane
New Milford, CT 06776 / US
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Maureau, Philippe , et al
Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU
12, rue Boileau
B.P. 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Maureau, Philippe , et al
Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [2000/10]Hartmann, Jean-Luc , et al
Cabinet Germain & Maureau, B.P. 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Application number, filing date98963857.210.12.1998
[2000/10]
WO1998US26334
Priority number, dateUS19970068993P29.12.1997         Original published format: US 68993 P
[2000/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9934374
Date:08.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0983596
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999
[2000/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01C7/12, H02H1/00, H02H1/04, H02H3/20, H02H3/22, H02H9/04, H02H9/06
[2000/10]
Designated contracting statesES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/10]
TitleGerman:SCHUTZ GEGEN ÜBERSTRÖME UND TRANSIENTE SPANNUNGEN[2000/10]
English:CURRENT AND TRANSIENT VOLTAGE PROTECTOR[2000/10]
French:DISPOSITIF PROTECTEUR CONTRE LES SURINTENSITES DE COURANT ET LES SURTENSIONS TRANSITOIRES[2000/10]
Entry into regional phase30.08.1999National basic fee paid 
30.08.1999Search fee paid 
30.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/10]
01.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/02]
06.08.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4924345  (SIEMON JOHN A [US], et al);
 [A]US3825867  (GEORGOPULOS T);
 [A]US5341269  (HAYWARD GREGORY R [US], et al)