EP1039946 - DISPENSER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/40] | FIBRIN MIXTURE AND DISPENSER ASSEMBLY | ||
[2007/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06856 / US | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | ||
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | ||
For all designated states Roby, Mark S. 11 Grace Lane Kilingworth, CT 06419 / US | |||
For all designated states Aranyi, Ernie 170 Stepney Road Easton, CT 06612 / US | |||
For all designated states Yogami, Richard 4 Cottonwood Lane Ridgerield, CT 06877 / US | |||
For all designated states Tovey, Jonathan H. 8 Jamianna Lane Monroe, CT 06801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBY, Mark, S. 11 Grace Lane Kilingworth, CT 06419 / US | 02 /
ARANYI, Ernie 170 Stepney Road Easton, CT 06612 / US | 03 /
YOGAMI, Richard 4 Cottonwood Lane Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US | 04 /
TOVEY, H., Jonathan 8 Jamianna Lane Monroe, CT 06801 / US | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98963953.9 | 16.12.1998 | [2000/40] | WO1998US26688 | Priority number, date | US19970068273P | 19.12.1997 Original published format: US 68273 P | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9932155 | Date: | 01.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1039946 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1039946 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.10.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61M37/00, A61B17/00 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
A61B17/00491 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00495 (EP,US);
A61J1/16 (EP,US);
A61J1/201 (EP,US);
A61J1/2013 (EP,US);
A61J1/2055 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/40] | A61M37/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2000/40] | Title | German: | SPENDERANORDNUNG | [2007/18] | English: | DISPENSER ASSEMBLY | [2007/18] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR | [2007/18] |
Former [2000/40] | FIBRINGEMISCH UND SPENDERANORDNUNG | ||
Former [2000/40] | FIBRIN MIXTURE AND DISPENSER ASSEMBLY | ||
Former [2000/40] | ENSEMBLE MELANGE DE FIBRINE ET DISTRIBUTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 16.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08002353.4 / EP1955727 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3557787 (COHEN MILTON J) [Y] 1-3,5,11 * abstract * * column 3, lines 18-35 * * column 2, lines 5-17 *; | [XY]US3570486 (ENGELSHER HARVEY J, et al) [X] 10,14-17 * abstract * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 14 * [Y] 1-3,5,11; | [A]US4735616 (EIBL JOHANN [AT], et al) [A] 20 * the whole document *; | [A]US5067948 (HABER TERRY M [US], et al) [A] 3,5,15 * abstract *; | [A]US5649907 (MORI KENJI [JP], et al) [A] * column 6, lines 5-32; figure - * | International search | [AE]US5897527 (TSUKADA OSAMU [JP]) | by applicant | US5059166 | US5078736 | US5298018 | US5419760 | US5422362 | US5441497 | US5454794 | US5545569 |