Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1047928

EP1047928 - AUTOSAMPLER SYRINGE WITH COMPRESSION SEALING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.08.2008
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Waters Investments Limited
109 Lukens Drive New Castle
Delaware 19720 / US
[2007/43]
Former [2001/09]For all designated states
Waters Investments Limited
109 Lukens Drive
New Castle, Delaware 19720 / US
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Waters Investments Limited
34 Maple Street
Milford, MA 01757 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SGOURAKES, George, E.
41 Bullard Lane
Millis, MA 02054 / US
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Vossius, Corinna , et al
Corinna Vossius IP Group
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Widenmayerstrasse 43
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]Vossius, Corinna , et al
Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Holbeinstrasse 5
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date98963972.916.12.1998
[2000/44]
WO1998US26723
Priority number, dateUS1997099104116.12.1997         Original published format: US 991041
[2000/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9931479
Date:24.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1047928
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999
[2000/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1047928
Date:24.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.06.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2006
ClassificationInternational:G01N1/14
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/44]
TitleGerman:PROBENNEHMERSPRITZE MIT DRUCKABDICHTUNG[2000/44]
English:AUTOSAMPLER SYRINGE WITH COMPRESSION SEALING[2000/44]
French:SERINGUE D'ECHANTILLONNEUR AUTOMATIQUE A FERMETURE PAR COMPRESSION[2000/44]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2000National basic fee paid 
11.07.2000Search fee paid 
11.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
01.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.07.2007
11.06.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
05.09.2007Fee for grant paid
05.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0349264  (APEC INC [US]) [X] 1-11,16-21 * column 2, lines 6-8,33,34 * * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 58; figure - * [A] 12-15;
 [XA]US4089624  (NICHOLS PHILIP THORBUS, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 5, lines 48-55 * [A] 6,7,10-17;
 [XA]US4476095  (SCOTT ROBERT L [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 7, lines 50-66; figure 8 * [A] 12,16,18;
 [A]US3367746  (JONAS MAURUKAS)
International search[X]US4616514  (MAGNUSSEN JR HAAKON T [US], et al);
 [Y]US4660569  (ETHERINGTON ROGER F [US]);
 [Y]US4082121  (STURM RONALD LEO, et al);
 [YP]US5817955  (GHERSON PAUL [US], et al);
 [A]US4625572  (YAMASHITA KIYOSHI [JP])