Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1042506

EP1042506 - REAGENTS AND METHODS USEFUL FOR DETECTING DISEASES OF THE BREAST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.07.2002
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BILLING-MEDEL, Patricia, A.
34088 N Lavender Circle
Grayslake, IL 60030-2862 / US
02 / COHEN, Maurice
2026 Deerfield Road
Highland Park, IL 60035 / US
03 / COLPITTS, Tracey, L.
34365 North Circle Drive
Round Lake, IL 60073 / US
04 / FRIEDMAN, Paula, N.
462 Cumnor Court
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
05 / GORDON, Julian
307 East Sheridan Road
Lake Bluff, IL 60044 / US
06 / GRANADOS, Edward, N.
19 Montgomery Lane
Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US
07 / HODGES, Steven, C.
169 Stonegate Road
Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US
08 / KLASS, Michael, R.
1606 Mulberry Drive
Libertyville, IL 60048 / US
09 / KRATOCHVIL, Jon, D.
7101 Fifth Avenue
Kenosha, WI 53143 / US
10 / ROBERTS-RAPP, Lisa
2090 Westfield Drive
Gurnee, IL 60031 / US
11 / RUSSELL, John, C.
8275 64th Court
Kenosha, WI 53142 / US
12 / STROUPE, Stephen, D.
945 Wilshire Drive
Libertyville, IL 60048 / US
[2000/49]
Former [2000/41]01 / BILLING-MEDEL, Patricia, A.
34088 N Lavender Cir
Grayslake, IL 60030-2862 / US
02 / COHEN, Maurice
2026 Deerfield Road
Highland Park, IL 60035 / US
03 / COLPITTS, Tracey, L.
34365 North Circle Drive
Round Lake, IL 60073 / US
04 / FRIEDMAN, Paula, N.
462 Cumnor Court
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
05 / GORDON, Julian
307 East Sheridan Road
Lake Bluff, IL 60044 / US
06 / GRANADOS, Edward, N.
19 Montgomery Lane
Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US
07 / HODGES, Steven, C.
169 Stonegate Road
Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US
08 / KLASS, Michael, R.
1606 Mulberry Drive
Libertyville, IL 60048 / US
09 / KRATOCHVIL, Jon, D.
7101 Fifth Avenue
Kenosha, WI 53143 / US
10 / ROBERTS-RAPP, Lisa
2090 Westfield Drive
Gurnee, IL 60031 / US
11 / RUSSELL, John, C.
8275 64th Court
Kenosha, WI 53142 / US
12 / STROUPE, Stephen, D.
945 Wilshire Drive
Libertyville, IL 60048 / US
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date98964067.716.12.1998
[2000/41]
WO1998US26918
Priority number, dateUS1997099849626.12.1997         Original published format: US 998496
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9934017
Date:08.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1042506
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999
[2000/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, C12N15/12, C12N5/10, C07K16/18, C07K14/47, G01N33/574
[2000/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/41]
TitleGerman:REAGENZIEN UND METHODEN ZUR DETEKTION VON BRUSTERKRANKUNGEN[2000/41]
English:REAGENTS AND METHODS USEFUL FOR DETECTING DISEASES OF THE BREAST[2000/41]
French:REACTIFS ET PROCEDES UTILES POUR DECELER LES MALADIES DU SEIN[2000/41]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2000National basic fee paid 
13.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
06.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/35]
28.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DX]US5585462  (LONDOS CONSTANTINE [US], et al) [DX] 1-44 * columns 1-3 * * column 23, lines 46-54 * * columns 49-54 * * column 12, lines 30-44 * * column 14, line 6 - column 25, line 16 *;
 [A]WO9511923  (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US], et al) [A] 1-51 * page 1 - page 4, line 31 * * page 10, line 14 - page 11, line 24 * * page 22, lines 13-21 *;
 [A]WO9702280  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US]) [A] 1-51 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3 * * page 14, line 25 - page 15, line 13 * * page 16, paragraph 3 * * page 23, lines 15-31; examples 3,5 *;
 [A]WO9638463  (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al) [A] 1-51 * the whole document *;
 [PX]  - "Homo sapiens mRNA for perilipin", DATABASE EMBL, (19980409), XP002100564 [PX] 11-13,16-20,23-25,28,29,41,42,45,46 * abstract *
    [] - NISHIU ET AL., "Isolation and chromosomal mapping of the human homolog of perilipin (PLIN), a rat adipose tissue-specific gene, by differential display method", GENOMICS, (19980301), vol. 48, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1006/geno.1997.5179, pages 254 - 257, XP004449235

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1997.5179