Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1038033

EP1038033 - High-throughput assay and kit based on the use of nuclease protection fragments. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/39]HIGH THROUGHPUT ASSAY SYSTEM
[2007/42]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2009
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Felder, Stephen
7064 North Cathedral Rock Place
Tucson, AZ 85718 / US
For all designated states
Kris, Richard
2602 E. Avenida de Posada
Tucson, AZ 85718 / US
[2000/39]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Weiss, Wolfgang , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr. , et al
Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date98964187.321.12.1998
[2000/39]
WO1998US27191
Priority number, dateUS19970068291P19.12.1997         Original published format: US 68291 P
US1998010907602.07.1998         Original published format: US 109076
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9932663
Date:01.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1038033
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1038033
Date:16.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
Extension statesAL19.06.2000
LT19.06.2000
LV19.06.2000
MK19.06.2000
RO19.06.2000
SI19.06.2000
TitleGerman:Auf die Verwendung von nukleaseresistenten Fragmenten basierende Verfahren und Kits, die für Nukleinsäuretests mit hohem Durchsatz geeignet sind[2007/42]
English:High-throughput assay and kit based on the use of nuclease protection fragments.[2007/42]
French:Procédés et kits basés sur l'utilisation des fragments résistants à une nucléase et utilisables pour des dosages à hauts rendements[2007/42]
Former [2000/39]TESTSYSTEM MIT HOHEM DURCHSATZ
Former [2000/39]HIGH THROUGHPUT ASSAY SYSTEM
Former [2000/39]SYSTEME DE DOSAGE A HAUT RENDEMENT
Entry into regional phase19.06.2000National basic fee paid 
19.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
04.09.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
31.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.02.2008Fee for grant paid
29.02.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.01.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
29.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200104   M06   Fee paid on   17.06.2002
31.12.200205   M06   Fee paid on   12.06.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
PT16.09.2008
LU21.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
[2019/12]
Former [2018/28]CY16.04.2008
ES16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
PT16.09.2008
LU21.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2017/51]CY16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
PT16.09.2008
LU21.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2010/28]CY16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
PT16.09.2008
LU21.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2010/06]CY16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
PT16.09.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2008/49]FI16.04.2008
PT16.09.2008
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9731256  (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11,16-20,26-30 * the whole document * [Y] 21-25;
 [X]WO9733000  (GENETRACE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 31-40 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9629431  (SEQUENOM INC [US]) [X] 31-40 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9705277  (GENSET SA [FR], et al) [Y] 21-25 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0721016  (AFFYMAX TECH NV [AN]) [Y] 31-40 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9747640  (SARNOFF CORP [US]) [Y] 31-40 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0698792  (NISSUI PHARM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5556748  (DOUGLAS ALLAN S [US]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19518217  (IMTEC IMMUNDIAGNOSTIKA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9727317  (AFFYMETRIX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0742286  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - NIEMEYER C M ET AL, "OLIGONUCLEOTIDE-DIRECTED SELF-ASSEMBLY OF PROTEINS: SEMISYNTHETIC DNA-STREPTAVIDIN HYBRID MOLECULES AS CONNECTORS FOR THE GENERATION OF MACROSCOPIC ARRAYS AND THE CONSTRUCTION OF SUPRAMOLECULAR BIOCONJUGATES", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (19940101), vol. 22, no. 25, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 5530 - 5539, XP000645135 [X] 1-10,12-20,26,27,29,30 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - LITTLE D P ET AL, "MALDI ON A CHIP: ANALYSIS OF ARRAYS OF LOW-FEMTOMOLE TO SUBFEMTOMOLE QUANTITIES OF SYNTHETIC OLIGONUCLEOTIDES AND DNA DIAGNOSTIC PRODUCTS DISPENSED BY A PIEZOELECTRIC PIPET", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, (199711), vol. 69, no. 22, ISSN 0003-2700, page 4540-4546, XP000727173 [Y] 31-40 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac970758+
 [Y]  - TANG K ET AL, "MATRIX-ASSISTED LASER DESORPTION/IONIZATION OF RESTRICTION ENZYME-DIGESTED DNA", RAPID COMMUNICATIONS IN MASS SPECTROMETRY,GB,LONDON, (1994), vol. 8, no. 2, page 183-186, XP000608266 [Y] 31-40 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/rcm.1290080212
 [A]  - MAIER ET AL, "AUTOMATED ARRAY TECHNOLOGIES FOR GENE EXPRESSION PROFILING", DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, (199708), vol. 2, no. 8, ISSN 1359-6446, pages 315 - 324 324, XP002103832 [A] 1-30 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6446(97)01054-4
 [A]  - SARRACINO D ET AL, "Quantitative MALDI-TOF MS of oligonucleotides and a nuclease assay", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS,GB,OXFORD, (1996), vol. 6, no. 21, ISSN 0960-894X, page 2543-2548, XP004135910 [A] 31-40 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0960-894X(96)00465-9
ExaminationEP0709468
 WO9535505