blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1099137


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.12.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  26.01.2005  [2005/04]
20.08.2004 Supplementary search report published on  06.10.2004  [2004/41]
20.08.2004 Change - classification published on  06.10.2004  [2004/41]
16.08.2004 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
31.01.2004 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
13.12.2002 Renewal fee
21.12.2001 Renewal fee
30.03.2001 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.05.2001 [2001/20]
30.03.2001 Request for examination filed published on  16.05.2001 [2001/20]
01.03.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
27.02.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
07.12.2000 Renewal fee
05.12.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
28.04.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
08.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
06.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
09.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication