blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1099137
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002516915Global Dossier 11.06.2002A
Priority number Date
US8703798 28.05.1998
US9827321 19.12.1998
US19990498 25.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1099137Global Dossier 06.10.2004A4
EP1099137 16.05.2001A1
Priority number Date
US8703798 28.05.1998
US9827321 19.12.1998
US19990498 25.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU1940999 13.12.1999A
Priority number Date
US8703798 28.05.1998
US9827321 19.12.1998
US19990498 25.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9815874 23.10.2001A
Priority number Date
US8703798 28.05.1998
US9827321 19.12.1998
US19990498 25.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2332120 02.12.1999A1
Priority number Date
US8703798 28.05.1998
US9827321 19.12.1998
US19990498 25.11.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9961955Global Dossier 02.12.1999A1
Priority number Date
US8703798 28.05.1998
US19990498 25.11.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1303489 11.07.2001A
Priority number Date
US8703798 28.05.1998
US19990498 25.11.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6312822 06.11.2001B1
Priority number Date
US8703798 28.05.1998
US19990498 25.11.1998