Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099137

EP1099137 - DISPERSION AIDS FOR OPTICAL BRIGHTENERS IN POLYOLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.01.2005  [2005/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY
100 North Eastman Road
Kingsport TN 37660 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY
100 North Eastman Road
Kingsport, TN 37660 / US
Inventor(s)01 / IRICK, Gether, Jr.
113 South Patrick Drive
Gray, TN 37615 / US
02 / FARRAR, Joe, Lannes
278 Dogwood Drive
Fall Branch, TN 37656 / US
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Brown, Fraser Gregory James , et al
Cleveland
10 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Brown, Fraser Gregory James , et al
fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
Application number, filing date98964234.319.12.1998
[2001/20]
WO1998US27321
Priority number, dateUS19980087037P28.05.1998         Original published format: US 87037 P
US1998019990425.11.1998         Original published format: US 199904
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9961955
Date:02.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1099137
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999
[2001/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.12.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2004
ClassificationInternational:G03C1/775, G03C1/815, G03C1/79, C08K5/00, C08L23/04, C08L23/08
[2004/41]
Former International [2001/20]G03C1/775, G03C1/815
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/20]
TitleGerman:DISPERGIERHILFSMITTEL FÜR OPTISCHE AUFHELLER IN POLYOLEFINEN[2001/20]
English:DISPERSION AIDS FOR OPTICAL BRIGHTENERS IN POLYOLEFINS[2001/20]
French:AGENTS AUXILIAIRES DE DISPERSION POUR AZURANTS OPTIQUES DANS LES POLYOLEFINES[2001/20]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2000National basic fee paid 
27.11.2000Search fee paid 
27.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/20]
01.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/04]
20.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
06.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4895757  (WYSK WOLFRAM ET AL) [X] 1-8 * column 4, lines 20-30; example 6; claims 1,9 *;
 [X]EP0810471  (EASTMAN KODAK CO) [X] 1 * claims 1,3,5,8 *;
 [A]DE4308440  (SCHOELLER FELIX JUN PAPIER) [A] 1,10 * page 2, line 68 - page 3, line 10 *
International search[X]US5340854  ;
 [A]US5061610  ;
 [A]US4794071  ;
 [A]US4106941  ;
 [A]US3449257