Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1051469

EP1051469 - LOW FOAMING SURFACTANT COMPOSITIONS USEFUL IN HIGHLY ALKALINE CAUSTIC CLEANERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  20.05.2005
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2005Refusal of applicationpublished on 06.07.2005  [2005/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RHODIA INC.
CN 7500, 259 Prospect Plains Road Cranbury
New Jersey 08512-7500 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
RHODIA INC.
CN 7500, 259 Prospect Plains Road
Cranbury, New Jersey 08512-7500 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DAHANAYAKE, Manilal, S.
17 Reed Drive North
Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US
02 / VENTURA, Mark, E.
32 Hampton Drive
Freehold, NJ 07728 / US
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Boittiaux, Vincent
Rhodia Services
Direction de la Propriété Industrielle
40, rue de la Haie-Coq
93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2004/17]Boittiaux, Vincent
Rhodia Services, DPI, 40, rue de la Haie-Coq
93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR
Former [2000/46]Wattremez, Catherine
Rhodia Services, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, 25, quai Paul Doumer
92408 Courbevoie-Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date98964260.823.12.1998
[2000/46]
WO1998US27357
Priority number, dateUS1998001600830.01.1998         Original published format: US 16008
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9938942
Date:05.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1051469
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999
[2000/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:C11D1/94, C11D3/02, C11D3/20, C11D3/37, // C11D1/92, C11D1/72, C11D3/37
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/46]
Extension statesAL24.08.2000
LT24.08.2000
LV24.08.2000
RO24.08.2000
SI24.08.2000
TitleGerman:SCHWACHSCHÄUMENDE TENSIDZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN GEEIGNET FÜR STARK ALKALISCHE REINIGUNGSMITTEL[2000/46]
English:LOW FOAMING SURFACTANT COMPOSITIONS USEFUL IN HIGHLY ALKALINE CAUSTIC CLEANERS[2000/46]
French:COMPOSITIONS TENSIO-ACTIVES PEU MOUSSANTES UTILES DANS DES PRODUITS DE NETTOYAGE CAUSTIQUES FORTEMENT ALCALINS[2000/46]
Entry into regional phase24.08.2000National basic fee paid 
24.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
24.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
14.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/27]
13.02.2005Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/27]
Request for further processing for:17.12.2003Request for further processing filed
17.12.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.01.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9629384  (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7 * claim - * * example - * * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 2 * [Y] 1,4-8,21,24-28;
 [YA]EP0263911  (MIRANOL INC [US]) [Y] 1,4-8,21,24-28 * 20 April 1988;; claim - * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 55 * [A] 2,3,9-20,22,23;
 [A]WO9738079  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-8,11-18,21-28 * 16 October 1997;; claims 8-11 * * example 3 * * page 2, line 8 - line 13 * * page 6, line 34 - page 7, line 6 *;
 [A]US5486315  (TSENG CHUEN-ING J [US]) [A] 1,11,21 * abstract * * claims 5-17 * * example 5 * * column 1, line 6 - line 16 * * column 4, line 39 - line 42 *