Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033922

EP1033922 - ELECTROMAGNETIC FIELD DEFLECTING GARMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.06.2003
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 12.11.2003  [2003/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alpini, Edilio Livio
Via G. Gavotti, 1
27050 Pancarana / IT
[2000/37]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Petruzziello, Aldo
Racheli S.r.l.
Viale San Michele del Carso, 4
20144 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Petruzziello, Aldo
Racheli & C. s.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4
20144 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98964433.123.11.1998
[2000/37]
WO1998EP07556
Priority number, dateIT1997MI0263827.11.1997         Original published format: IT MI972638
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9927807
Date:10.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1033922
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1033922
Date:07.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:A41D13/00, G21F3/02, H05K9/00
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES FELD ABLENKENDE BEKLEIDUNG[2000/37]
English:ELECTROMAGNETIC FIELD DEFLECTING GARMENT[2000/37]
French:VETEMENT DETOURNANT UN CHAMP ELECTROMAGNETIQUE[2000/37]
Entry into regional phase26.05.2000National basic fee paid 
26.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
08.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2002Fee for grant paid
18.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200104   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK07.11.2002
[2003/46]
Cited inInternational search[YP]JPH10226908  ;
 [YA]US5073984  (TONE MASASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 25; figures 1-7B; claims 1,2,6,8 * [A] 9,11;
 [AP]DE19633315  (AHRENS WERNER [DE], et al) [AP] 1,11 * column 1, line 20 - column 2, line 44; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE29612459U  (LANGE ALEXANDER [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2745690  (EGIS S A R L [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 17; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9715931  (VIGNUDELLI ADRIANO [IT]) [A] 1-3 * page 3, line 20 - page 5, line 2; figures 1-6; claims 1,2 *
 [YP]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 098, no. 013, [YP] 1 * abstract *