Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1036340

EP1036340 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMAGING TARGET DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.06.2005  [2005/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RAYTHEON COMPANY
141 Spring Street
Lexington
Massachusetts 02421 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Raytheon Company
141 Spring Street
Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DEAETT, Michael, Allen
232 Cole Drive
North Kingstown, RI 02852 / US
02 / DEGRAAF, Erik, Jacob
5 Drew Woods Drive
Derry, NH 03038 / US
03 / JOHNSON, Stephen, Guild
32 Sakonnet Trail
Little Compton, RI 02837 / US
04 / NORCROSS, Melinda, Lee
10 Hazelwood Drive
Hudson, NH 03051 / US
05 / PAWLAK, Anthony, John
720 South Main Street
Manchester, NH 03102 / US
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Jones, Graham Henry
Graham Jones & Company
77 Beaconsfield Road
Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Jones, Graham H.
Graham Jones & Company Blackheath 77 Beaconsfield Road
London SE3 7LG / GB
Application number, filing date98964698.930.11.1998
[2000/38]
WO1998US25401
Priority number, dateUS1997098459203.12.1997         Original published format: US 984592
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9928759
Date:10.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1036340
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1036340
Date:09.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01S3/786
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/38]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR ZIELERFASSUNG IN ABBILDUNGSSYSTEMEN[2000/38]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMAGING TARGET DETECTION[2000/38]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'IMAGERIE DE DETECTION DE CIBLE[2000/38]
Entry into regional phase02.06.2000National basic fee paid 
02.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
02.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
28.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2004Fee for grant paid
26.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
16.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200003   M06   Fee paid on   08.03.2001
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5341142  (REIS JAMES J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,11-14,16,17,23,24 * column 1, line 1 - line 11 * * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 4 * * column 13, line 42 - column 14, line 6 * * column 14, line 60 - column 15, line 24 * * column 46, line 38 - column 47, line 42 * * figure 7 * [Y] 3,7-9,15,19-21;
 [YA]US5149970  (WHITNEY COLIN G [US]) [Y] 7-9,19-21 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 62 * [A] 10,22;
 [A]FR2688909  (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 6,18 * abstract *;
 [A]US4739401  (SACKS JACK M [US], et al) [A] 1,12,13,24 * abstract * * column 1, line 35 - column 3, line 60 * * column 4, line 19 - line 28 * * column 9, line 3 - column 11, line 40 *
 [Y]  - OEHLER K L ET AL, "COMBINING IMAGE COMPRESSION AND CLASSIFICATION USING VECTOR QUANTIZATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (19950501), vol. 17, no. 5, pages 461 - 473, XP000505707 [Y] 3,15 * abstract * * page 469, section B.2. Aerial Images *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.391396