Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1041982

EP1041982 - INHIBITION OF p38 KINASE ACTIVITY USING SUBSTITUTED HETEROCYCLIC UREAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2012
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 17.07.2013  [2013/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer HealthCare LLC
555 White Plains Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
[2009/32]
Former [2005/11]For all designated states
Bayer Pharmaceuticals Corp.
400 Morgan Lane
West Haven, CT 06516 / US
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
Bayer Corporation
100 Bayer Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DUMAS, Jacques
821 Beechwood Road
Orange, CT 06477 / US
02 / KHIRE, Uday
101 Tanglewood Drive
Hamden, CT 06518 / US
03 / LOWINGER, Timothy, B.
5-7, 1203 Chitose-cuo
Nishinomiya, Hyogo 662-0046 / JP
04 / PAULSEN, Holger
Pahlkestrasse 5
D-42115 Wuppertal / DE
05 / RIEDL, Bernd
Von der Goltz Strasse 7
42329 Wuppertal / DE
06 / SCOTT, William, J.
210 Saddle Hill Drive
Guilford, CT 06437 / US
07 / SMITH, Roger, A.
65 Winterhill Road
Madison, CT 06443 / US
08 / WOOD, Jill, E.
72 Pickwick Road
Hamden, CT 06517 / US
09 / HATOUM-MOKDAD, Holia
43 Joseph Lane
Hamden, CT 06514 / US
10 / JOHNSON, Jeffrey
58 Gould Lane
Branford, CT 06405 / US
11 / LEE, Wendy
282 Evergreen Avenue
Hamden, CT 06518 / US
12 / REDMAN, Aniko
66 E. Street
Derby, CT 06418 / US
 [2011/42]
Former [2000/44]01 / DUMAS, Jacques
821 Beechwood Road
Orange, CT 06477 / US
02 / KHIRE, Uday
101 Tanglewood Drive
Hamden, CT 06518 / US
03 / LOWINGER, Timothy, B.
5-7, 1203 Chitose-cuo
Nishinmiya, Hyogo 662-0046 / JP
04 / PAULSEN, Holger
Pahlkestrasse 5
D-42115 Wuppertal / DE
05 / RIEDL, Bernd
Von der Goltz Strasse 7
42329 Wuppertal / DE
06 / SCOTT, William, J.
210 Saddle Hill Drive
Guilford, CT 06437 / US
07 / SMITH, Roger, A.
65 Winterhill Road
Madison, CT 06443 / US
08 / WOOD, Jill, E.
72 Pickwick Road
Hamden, CT 06517 / US
09 / HATOUM-MOKDAD, Holia
43 Joseph Lane
Hamden, CT 06514 / US
10 / JOHNSON, Jeffrey
58 Gould Lane
Branford, CT 06405 / US
11 / LEE, Wendy
282 Evergreen Avenue
Hamden, CT 06518 / US
12 / REDMAN, Aniko
66 E. Street
Derby, CT 06418 / US
Former [2000/41]01 / DUMAS, Jacques
821 Beechwood Road
Orange, CT 06477 / US
02 / KHIRE, Uday
101 Tanglewood Drive
Hamden, CT 06518 / US
03 / LOWINGER, Timothy, B.
5-7, 1203 Chitose-cuo
Nishinmiya, Hyogo 662-0046 / JP
04 / PAULSEN, Holger
Pahlkestrasse 5
D-42115 Wuppertal / DE
05 / RIEDL, Bernd
13 Cedrus Court
Branford, CT 06405 / US
06 / SCOTT, William, J.
210 Saddle Hill Drive
Guilford, CT 06437 / US
07 / SMITH, Roger, A.
65 Winterhill Road
Madison, CT 06443 / US
08 / WOOD, Jill, E.
72 Pickwick Road
Hamden, CT 06517 / US
09 / HATOUM-MOKDAD, Holia
43 Joseph Lane
Hamden, CT 06514 / US
10 / JOHNSON, Jeffrey
213 Leetes Island Road
Branford, CT 06405 / US
11 / LEE, Wendy
282 Evergreen Avenue
Hamden, CT 06518 / US
12 / REDMAN, Aniko
66 E. Street
Derby, CT 06418 / US
Representative(s)Weiss, Wolfgang , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr. , et al
Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date98964709.422.12.1998
[2000/41]
WO1998US26080
Priority number, dateUS1997099575022.12.1997         Original published format: US 995750
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9932111
Date:01.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1041982
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999
[2000/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1041982
Date:19.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/415, A61K31/4439, A61P29/00, A61P37/02
[2011/21]
Former International [2000/41]A61K31/415, A61K31/38, A61K31/385, A61K31/35
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/41]
Extension statesAL21.06.2000
LT21.06.2000
LV21.06.2000
MK21.06.2000
RO21.06.2000
SI21.06.2000
TitleGerman:HEMMUNG DER p38 KINASE AKTIVITÄT DURCH SUBSTITUIERTE HETEROCYCLISCHE HARNSTOFFE[2011/21]
English:INHIBITION OF p38 KINASE ACTIVITY USING SUBSTITUTED HETEROCYCLIC UREAS[2000/41]
French:INHIBITION DE L'ACTIVITE DE P38 KINASE AU MOYEN D'UREES HETEROCYCLIQUES SUBSTITUEES[2000/41]
Former [2000/41]HEMMUNG DER p38 KINASE AKTIVITÄT DURCH SUBSTITUIERTEN HETEROCYCLISCHEN HARNSTOFFEN
Entry into regional phase21.06.2000National basic fee paid 
21.06.2000Search fee paid 
21.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
26.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2011Fee for grant paid
31.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.10.2006
Opposition(s)20.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.10.2011
BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
FI19.10.2011
LU19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
IE22.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
GR20.01.2012
PT20.02.2012
[2013/29]
Former [2013/25]AT19.10.2011
BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
LU19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
IE22.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
GR20.01.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2013/07]AT19.10.2011
BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
IE22.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
GR20.01.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/49]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
IE22.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
GR20.01.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/47]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
IE22.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
GR20.01.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/35]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
MC31.12.2011
GR20.01.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/33]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
MC31.12.2011
GR20.01.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/28]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
GR20.01.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/24]BE19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
GR20.01.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/23]BE19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
GR20.01.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/21]BE19.10.2011
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5559137  (ADAMS JERRY L [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,29-34 * the whole document, especially columns 11, 12, 17 and claims *;
 [A]WO9507922  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,29-33 * page 1 - page 20 *;
 [A]US5162360  (CRESWELL MARK W [US], et al) [A] 35,36 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3646059  (BRANTLEY RICHARD K) [A] 35 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO9856377  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-6,28-34 * the whole document, especially pages 6-8, page 11 line 29, pages 26-27, page 30 lines 8-16, claims 11,12 *;
 [PX]WO9852941  (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-6,29-34 * the whole document, especially page 7 lines 11-55, page 8 lines 1-20, page 56 *;
 [PX]WO9852558  (BAYER AG [US], et al) [PX] 1-4,28-34 * the whole document *;
 [PY]WO9852937  (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [PY] 1-6,29-34 * the whole document, especially page 39 example 5 and page 41 example 8 *;
 [E]WO9932110  (BAYER AG [US]) [E] 1-6,8,28-34 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO9923091  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [US]) [E] 1-6,8,29,31-34 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO9932106  (BAYER AG [US]) [E] 35,36 * page 73 example D4 and page 75 example D5a *;
 [E]WO9932455  (BAYER AG [US]) [E] 35,36 * page 4 lines 9-11,26-29; page 5 line 6; page 37 examples 38 and 39 *
 [Y]  - HANSON G J, "inhibitors of p38 kinase", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS, ASHLEY PUBLICATIONS, GB, (199707), vol. 7, no. 7, ISSN 1354-3776, pages 729 - 733, XP002086152 [Y] 1-6,29-34 * the whole document, especially introduction *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543776.7.7.729
International search[A]US5319099  (KAMATA SUSUMU [JP], et al)
Examination   - BADGER ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1996), vol. 279, no. 3, pages 1453 - 1461
    - SHAPIRO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1995), vol. 92, pages 12230 - 12234
    - G. HANSON, EXP. OPIN. THER. PATENTS, (1997), vol. 7, no. 7, pages 729 - 733
by applicantWO9507922
 WO9404157