Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032648

EP1032648 - NITRITE-OXIDIZING BACTERIAL STRAIN AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/36]BACTERIAL NITRITE OXIDIZER AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF
[2005/26]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.11.2010
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.12.2010  [2010/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tetra Holding (US), Inc.
3001 Commerce Street Blacksburg
Virginia 24060 / US
[2010/09]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
AQUARIA, INC.
6100 Condor Drive
Moorpark, CA 93021 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HOVANEC, Timothy, A.
15513 Mallory Court
Moorpark, CA 93021 / US
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Martin, David John , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Sussex House
83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester
M2 3LG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Martin, David John , et al
Marks & Clerk 43 Park Place Leeds
LS1 2RY / GB
Former [2007/51]Martin, David John , et al
Marks & Clerk 43 Park Place
Leeds LS1 2RY / GB
Former [2005/01]Banford, Paul Clifford , et al
Marks & Clerk, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester M2 3LG / GB
Former [2000/36]Lipscombe, Martin John , et al
Keith W Nash & Co, Pearl Assurance House, 90-92 Regent Street
Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB
Application number, filing date98964838.121.12.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998US27196
Priority number, dateUS19970068492P22.12.1997         Original published format: US 68492 P
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9932603
Date:01.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032648
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999
[2000/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/12, C07C1/02
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:NITRITNOXIDIERENDER BAKTERIENSTAMM UND METHODEN ZU DESSEN VERWENDUNG[2005/26]
English:NITRITE-OXIDIZING BACTERIAL STRAIN AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF[2005/26]
French:BACTERIE OXYDANT LE NITRITE ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION[2000/36]
Former [2000/36]BAKTERIELLER MITRITOXIDIERER UND METHODEN ZU DESSEN VERWENDUNG
Former [2000/36]BACTERIAL NITRITE OXIDIZER AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase29.06.2000National basic fee paid 
29.06.2000Search fee paid 
29.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
02.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
06.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
25.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/52]
09.08.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2010/52]
Request for further processing for:21.03.2006Request for further processing filed
22.03.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.04.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
08.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
07.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[X]  EHRICH S ET AL, "A new obligately chemolithoautotrophic, nitrite-oxidizing bacterium, Nitrospira moscoviensis sp. nov. and its phylogenetic relationship.", ARCHIVES OF MICROBIOLOGY. GERMANY JUL 1995, vol. 164, no. 1, ISSN 0302-8933, (199507), Database accession no. X82558.1, pages 16 - 23, URL: EBI, XP002267475 [X] 1-29 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002030050230
 [X]  EHRICH ET AL., DATABASE EMBL, Database accession no. X82558.1, URL: EBI, [X] 1-29 * abstract *
 [PX]  HOVANEC TIMOTHY A ET AL, "Nitrospira-like bacteria associated with nitrite oxidation in freshwater aquaria.", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (199801), vol. 64, no. 1, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 258 - 264, XP002267476 [PX] 1-29 * the whole document *
 [PX]  HOVANEC ET AL., DATABASE EMBL, Database accession no. AF035813.1, URL: EBI, [PX] 1-29 * abstract *
 [A]  HOVANEC TIMOTHY A ET AL, "Comparative analysis of nitrifying bacteria associated with freshwater and marine aquaria.", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 62, no. 8, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 2888 - 2896, XP002267477 [A] 1-29 * the whole document *
International search[A]US4737289  (CASTALDI FRANK J [US], et al)
by applicant   - WATSON, S. W.; J. B. WATERBURY, "Characteristics of two marine nitrite oxidizing bacteria", NITROSPINA GRACILIS NOV. GENT NOV. SP. AND NITROCOCCUS MOBILIS NOV. GEN. NOV. SP., (1971),