Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0966708

EP0966708 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING VALIDITY OF AN EXECUTABLE FILE DESCRIPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.10.2004  [2004/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schneider Automation Inc.
One High Street
North Andover, Massachusetts 01845 / US
[2003/16]
Former [1999/52]For all designated states
Square D Company
1415 South Roselle Road
Palatine, Illinois 60067-7399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TATE, Allan, R.
12 Putnam Road
Bedford, MA 01730 / US
02 / SAYLOR, Michael, J.
318 Maple Street
Carlisle, MA 01741 / US
03 / GROSSER, John, T.
6 Colony Brook Lane
Derry, NH 03038 / US
[1999/52]
Representative(s)Gray, John James , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/52]Gray, John James , et al
Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street
Glasgow G2 1RS / GB
Application number, filing date98964846.422.12.1998
[1999/52]
WO1998US27220
Priority number, dateUS1997099571122.12.1997         Original published format: US 995711
[1999/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9932973
Date:01.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0966708
Date:29.12.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999
[1999/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0966708
Date:15.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/00, G05B23/00
[1999/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [1999/52]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UM DIE GÜLTIGKEIT DER BESCHREIBUNG EINER AUSFÜHRBAREDATEI ZU IDENTIFIZIEREN[1999/52]
English:METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING VALIDITY OF AN EXECUTABLE FILE DESCRIPTION[1999/52]
French:PROCEDE D'IDENTIFICATION DE LA VALIDITE DE LA DESCRIPTION D'UN FICHIER EXECUTABLE[1999/52]
Entry into regional phase11.09.1999National basic fee paid 
11.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.1999Examination requested  [1999/52]
14.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2003Fee for grant paid
12.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]US5050212  (DYSON) [X] 1-8 * column W *;
 [A]DE19539793  (MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5421006  (JABLON ET AL.) [A] 1-8 * column A * * column 17, line 48 - column 18, line 15; figures 6,10 *;
 [A]US5155847  (KIROUAC ET AL) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0449242  (NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION);
 [A]WO9515522  (SCHEELE ET AL.);
 [A]WO9325024  (CYBERLOCK DATA INTELLIGENCE)