Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1049923

EP1049923 - DETECTOR HAVING A TRANSMISSION GRATING BEAM SPLITTER FOR MULTI-WAVELENGTH SAMPLE ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.12.2006
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.01.2007  [2007/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spectrumedix LLC
2124 Old Gatesburg Road
State College, PA 16803 / US
[2005/48]
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
Spectrumedix Corporation
2124 Old Gatesburg Road
State College, PA 16803 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Changsheng
697 Tanager Drive
State College, PA 16803 / US
02 / LI, Quingbo
2234 Autumnwood Drive
State College, PA 16801 / US
 [2001/09]
Former [2001/06]01 / LIU, Changsheng
Apartment 106, 425 Waupelani Drive
State College, PA 16803 / US
02 / LI, Quingbo
2234 Autumnwood Drive
State College, PA 16801 / US
Former [2000/45]01 / LIU, Changsheng
Apartment 106, 425 Waupelani Drive
State College, PA 16803 / US
02 / LI, Qingbo
923 Stratford Court
State College, PA 16801 / US
Representative(s)MacDougall, Donald Carmichael , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow
G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]MacDougall, Donald Carmichael , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date98964854.822.12.1998
[2000/45]
WO1998US27259
Priority number, dateUS19970068527P22.12.1997         Original published format: US 68527 P
US1998008423626.05.1998         Original published format: US 84236
[2000/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9932877
Date:01.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1049923
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999
[2000/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/64, G01N27/447
[2002/15]
Former International [2000/45]G01N21/64
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/45]
TitleGerman:DETEKTOR MIT TRANSMISSIONSGITTER ALS STRAHLTEILER ZUR PROBENANALYSE MIT MEHREREN WELLENLÄNGEN[2000/45]
English:DETECTOR HAVING A TRANSMISSION GRATING BEAM SPLITTER FOR MULTI-WAVELENGTH SAMPLE ANALYSIS[2000/45]
French:DETECTEUR A RESEAU DE TRANSMISSION A SEPARATEUR DE FAISCEAU POUR L'ANALYSE D'ECHANTILLONS PAR FREQUENCES MULTIPLES[2000/45]
Entry into regional phase20.07.2000National basic fee paid 
20.07.2000Search fee paid 
20.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
20.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
04.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/02]
08.08.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
03.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200407   M06   Fee paid on   03.03.2005
31.12.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0314045  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-21 * page 4, line 31 - line 45; figure 1 *;
 [X]DE3618605  (EUROP LAB MOLEKULARBIOLOG [DE]) [X] 1-21 * column 9, line 18 - column 11, line 4; figure 4 *;
 [X]US5483075  (SMITH DOUGLAS H [US], et al) [X] 5-15,20,21 * column 6, line 40 - column 8, line 36; figures 1A,1B *;
 [X]EP0798559  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 5-14,16-18,20 * page 7, line 41 - page 8, line 2; figure 2 *
 [DX]  KARGER A E ET AL, "MULTIWAVELENGTH FLUORESCENCE DETECTION FOR SNA SEQUENCING USING CAPILLARY ELECTROPHORESIS", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1991), vol. 19, no. 18, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 4955 - 4962, XP000198096 [DX] 1-14,16-18,20 * page 4956; figure 1 *
International search[A]US5534703  (KAMBARA HIDEKI [JP], et al);
 [AP]US5713364  (DEBARYSHE GREGORY [US], et al);
 [A]US5303026  (STROBL KARLHEINZ [US], et al);
 [A]US5112125  (NEUMANN BURKHARD [DE])