blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0968327 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0968327



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 68
26.05.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 12
26.05.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
14.06.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
01.07.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.07.1999 Priority document Search / examination 14
24.11.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.10.2000 Text intended for grant Search / examination 10
10.10.2000 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.10.2000 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
20.10.2000 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.11.2000 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
14.12.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
14.12.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
14.12.2000 Reply to communication about intention to grant Search / examination 1
20.04.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.04.2002 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1