blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0968327


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.12.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.01.2004  [2004/04]
13.06.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.07.2003  [2003/31]
17.05.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.07.2002  [2002/27]
05.04.2002 No opposition filed within time limit published on  22.05.2002  [2002/21]
13.04.2001 (Expected) grant published on  30.05.2001 [2001/22]
07.12.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.11.2000 Communication of intention to grant
09.11.2000 Communication of intention to grant
09.11.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.10.2000 Renewal fee
13.10.2000 First examination report
06.10.2000 Communication of intention to grant
19.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
19.11.1999 Request for examination filed published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
15.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
16.07.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
16.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
04.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
23.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication