blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0968327
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2000508391Global Dossier 04.07.2000A
Priority number Date
DE9803412 18.11.1998
DE19751354 20.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0968327Global Dossier 30.05.2001B1
EP0968327 05.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE9803412 18.11.1998
DE19751354 20.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT201728T 15.06.2001T
Priority number Date
DE9803412 18.11.1998
DE19751354 20.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59800797D 05.07.2001D1
Priority number Date
DE9803412 18.11.1998
DE19751354 20.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6138719 31.10.2000A
Priority number Date
DE9803412 18.11.1998
DE19751354 20.11.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9927171Global Dossier 03.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19751354 20.11.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19751354 17.06.1999C1
Priority number Date
DE19751354 20.11.1997