Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968327

EP0968327 - AUXILIARY BLOW NOZZLE FOR AN AIR JET WEAVING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 21.01.2004  [2004/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lindauer Dornier GmbH
Rickenbacher Strasse 119
88129 Lindau / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
LINDAUER DORNIER GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H
Rickenbacher Strasse 119
88129 Lindau / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KERNER, Horst
Am Katzenholz 10
D-88161 Lindenberg / DE
02 / LUDWIG, Hubertus
Flurstrasse 16d
D-88131 Lindau / DE
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date98965080.918.11.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998DE03412
Priority number, dateDE199715135420.11.1997         Original published format: DE 19751354
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9927171
Date:03.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968327
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968327
Date:30.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:D03D47/30
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   PT [2000/01]
TitleGerman:HILFSBLASDÜSE FÜR EINE LUFTDÜSENWEBMASCHINE[2000/01]
English:AUXILIARY BLOW NOZZLE FOR AN AIR JET WEAVING MACHINE[2000/01]
French:BUSE DE SOUFFLAGE AUXILIAIRE DESTINEE A UN METIER A TISSER A BUSE D'AIR[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase05.07.1999National basic fee paid 
05.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
10.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2000Fee for grant paid
30.11.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipPT30.08.2001
AT18.11.2001
ES30.11.2001
[2004/04]
Former [2003/31]PT30.08.2001
AT18.11.2001
Former [2002/27]PT30.08.2001
Cited inInternational search[AD]US4987930  (OKESAKU MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [AD] 1 * figure - *;
 [AD]EP0145824  (SULZER AG [CH]) [AD] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]CH656905  (SULZER AG) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]CH650035  (SULZER AG) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]DE2740108  (RUETI AG MASCHF) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [PX]DE29720595U  (DORNIER GMBH LINDAUER [DE]) [PX] 1-8 * the whole document *